EP1253933 - USE OF NEUROTOXINS IN MEDICAMENTS FOR THYROID DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/45] | METHOD FOR TREATING THYROID DISORDERS | ||
[2002/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states Allergan, Inc. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, California 92612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONOVAN, Stephen 27252 Calle Anejo Capistrano Beach, CA 92624 / US | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01910800.0 | 15.02.2001 | [2002/45] | WO2001US04990 | Priority number, date | US20000504538 | 15.02.2000 Original published format: US 504538 | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0160396 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1253933 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1253933 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16, A61P5/14 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
A61K38/4893 (EP,US);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P5/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON NEUROTOXINEN IN MEDIKAMENTEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON THYROIDSTÖRUNGEN | [2002/49] | English: | USE OF NEUROTOXINS IN MEDICAMENTS FOR THYROID DISORDERS | [2002/49] | French: | UTILISATION DE NEUROTOXINES DANS DES MEDICAMENTS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES THYROIDIENS | [2002/49] |
Former [2002/45] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON THYROIDSTÖRUNGEN | ||
Former [2002/45] | METHOD FOR TREATING THYROID DISORDERS | ||
Former [2002/45] | METHODE DE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES THYROIDIENS | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 03.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.07.2003 | BE | 16.07.2003 | CH | 16.07.2003 | CY | 16.07.2003 | FI | 16.07.2003 | LI | 16.07.2003 | NL | 16.07.2003 | TR | 16.07.2003 | DK | 16.10.2003 | GR | 16.10.2003 | SE | 16.10.2003 | PT | 16.12.2003 | LU | 15.02.2004 | IE | 16.02.2004 | MC | 28.02.2004 | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/51] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
TR | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
PT | 16.12.2003 | ||
LU | 15.02.2004 | ||
IE | 16.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
PT | 16.12.2003 | ||
LU | 15.02.2004 | ||
IE | 16.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
PT | 16.12.2003 | ||
IE | 16.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
PT | 16.12.2003 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
PT | 16.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 16.07.2003 | |
NL | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | NL | 16.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9428922 (ALLERGAN INC [US]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]EP0770395 (ALLERGAN INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |