EP1255546 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING BONE MODELING AND CHONDROCYTE FUNCTIONING IN GROWING CANINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE IAMS COMPANY 7250 Poe Avenue Dayton, Ohio 45414 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states THE IAMS COMPANY 7250 Poe Avenue Dayton, Ohio 45414 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATKINS, Bruce, A. 3311 Boon Street West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | 02 /
LEPINE, Allan, J. 6475 Landsend Court Dayton, OH 45414 / US | 03 /
HAYEK, Michael, G. 926 Tammy Circle Dayton, OH 45415 / US | 04 /
REINHART, Gregory, A. 6950 Peters Pike Dayton, OH 45414 / US | [2003/05] |
Former [2002/46] | 01 /
WATKINS, Bruce, A. 3311 Boon Street West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | ||
02 /
LEPINE, Allan, J. 5451 Hickory Court Lewisburg, OH 45338 / US | |||
03 /
HAYEK, Michael, G. 926 Tammy Circle Dayton, OH 45415 / US | |||
04 /
REINHART, Gregory, A. 6950 Peters Pike Dayton, OH 45414 / US | Representative(s) | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane, Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2003/49] | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Patent Department, Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2002/46] | Caldwell, Judith Margaret, et al David Keltie Associates Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 01910860.4 | 16.02.2001 | [2002/46] | WO2001US05094 | Priority number, date | US20000183294P | 17.02.2000 Original published format: US 183294 P | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0160356 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1255546 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1255546 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1255546 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/20, A23K1/16, A23K1/18, A61P19/00 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/202 (EP,US);
A23K20/158 (EP,US);
A23K50/40 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
Y10S426/805 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/46] | A61K31/20, A23K1/16, A23K1/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERTER KNOCHENFORMUNG UND CHONDROZYTENBETRIEB IN WACHSENDEN HUNDEN | [2004/49] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPROVING BONE MODELING AND CHONDROCYTE FUNCTIONING IN GROWING CANINES | [2002/46] | French: | PROCEDE DESTINE A AMELIORER LA MODELISATION OSSEUSE ET LE FONCTIONNEMENT DU CHONDROCYTE CHEZ LES CHIENS EN PERIODE DE CROISSANCE | [2002/46] |
Former [2002/46] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBESSERTER KNOCHENFORMUNG UND CHONDROZYTENBETRIEB IN WACHSENDEN HUNDEN | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 12.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.05.2005 | BE | 04.05.2005 | CH | 04.05.2005 | CY | 04.05.2005 | FI | 04.05.2005 | IT | 04.05.2005 | LI | 04.05.2005 | TR | 04.05.2005 | DK | 04.08.2005 | GR | 04.08.2005 | SE | 04.08.2005 | PT | 17.10.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
BE | 04.05.2005 | ||
CH | 04.05.2005 | ||
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
IT | 04.05.2005 | ||
LI | 04.05.2005 | ||
TR | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
BE | 04.05.2005 | ||
CH | 04.05.2005 | ||
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
IT | 04.05.2005 | ||
LI | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
BE | 04.05.2005 | ||
CH | 04.05.2005 | ||
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
LI | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
BE | 04.05.2005 | ||
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 04.05.2005 | |
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 04.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04253908 ; | [A]US5069903 (STITT PAUL A [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 4, lines 22-26 * * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 9 * * claims 1,3 *; | [A]EP0585026 (SCOTIA HOLDINGS PLC [GB]) [A] 1-17 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 20 * * claims 1-3 *; | [PX] - ROGERS, L. L., WATKINS, B. A., TUREK, J. J., SCHOLEIN, I. A., LEPINE, A. J., REINHART, G. A., AND LI, Y., "Dietary n-3 and n-6 fatty acids effects on canine bone and ligament composition", FASEB JOURNAL., FED. OF AMERICAN SOC. FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, BETHESDA, MD., US, (20000315), vol. 14, no. 4, ISSN 0892-6638, page a252, XP002172303 [PX] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - SIMOPOULOS, A. P., The return of omega-3 fatty acids into the food supply. 1. Land based animal food products and their health effects, BASEL, S KARGER, (1998), XP002172304 [Y] 1-9,11-17 * Part 1:omega-3 Fatty acids and Health. "Regulatory effects of polyunsaturates on bone modeling and cartilage function", p. 38-51 * | [Y] - SIMOPOULOS, A. P. (ED.), The return of omega-3 fatty acids into the food supply. 1. Land based animal food products and their health effects, BASEL, S KARGER, (1998), XP002172305 [Y] 1-9,11-17 * Part 3: Companion Animal Nutrition. "Utilization of omega-3 fatty acids in companion animal nutrition", p. 176-185 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 43, Database accession no. 1992-352741, XP002172306 & JPH04253908 A 19920909 (NIPPON OILS AND FATS CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * abstract * |