EP1177695 - ASSIGNING A REMOTE UNIT A CHANNEL WITHIN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2002/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAN, Shaowei 157 W. Harbor Drive Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Jinzhong 1919 Prairie Square, No.132 Schaumburg, IL 60173 / US | 03 /
MENG, Chunyang 1119 Lexington Drive Lake Zurich, IL 60193 / US | 04 /
CAI, Hechun 42 Southfield Drive Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | 05 /
COMROE, Rich 10 Lexington Road South Barrington, IL 60010 / US | [2002/32] |
Former [2002/06] | 01 /
PAN, Shaowei 157 W. Harbor Drive Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US | ||
02 /
ZHANG, Jinzhong 1919 Prairie Square, No.132 Schaumburg, IL 60173 / US | |||
03 /
MENG, Chunyang 1119 Lexington Lane Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US | |||
04 /
CAI, Hechun 42 Southfield Drive Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | |||
05 /
COMROE, Rich 10 Lexington Road South Barrington, IL 60010 / US | Representative(s) | McCormack, Derek James, et al Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | McCormack, Derek James, et al Optimus, Grove House, Lutyens Close, Chineham Court Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [2002/06] | Potts, Susan Patricia, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01910918.0 | 16.02.2001 | [2002/06] | WO2001US05210 | Priority number, date | US20000516134 | 01.03.2000 Original published format: US 516134 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0165869 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1177695 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1177695 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.09.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/20, H04Q7/38 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
H04W72/30 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/23 (KR);
H04W4/08 (KR);
H04W72/1268 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2002/06] | H04Q7/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2004/36] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUTEILUNG EINES KANALS AN EINE ENTFERNTE EINKEIT INNERHALB EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMS | [2002/06] | English: | ASSIGNING A REMOTE UNIT A CHANNEL WITHIN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2002/06] | French: | AFFECTATION D'UN CANAL A UNE UNITE HORS SITE DANS UN SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATION | [2002/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 29.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5594948 (TALARMO REINO [FI], et al); | [A]US5936662 (KIM HYUNG-GI [KR], et al); | [A]US6005848 (GRUBE GARY W [US], et al); | [A]WO0004666 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) | International search | [A]US5794140 (SAWYER FRANCOIS [CA]); | [X]US5940763 (ALPEROVICH VLADIMIR [US], et al) |