EP1259677 - INTERCONNECTION OF TWO WOOD BEAMS THAT ARE JOINED TOGETHER WHILE FORMING AN AT LEAST APPROXIMATELY RIGHT ANGLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SFS intec Holding AG Nefenstrasse 30 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | [2006/06] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states SFS intec Holding AG Nefenstrasse 30 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTLE, Paul Widenstrasse 30a CH-9443 Widnau / CH | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Menges, Rolf Ackmann Menges Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 14 04 31 80454 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | Menges, Rolf Ackmann, Menges & Demski, Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 31 80454 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/25] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2002/48] | Ludescher, Hans, et al SFS Gruppe Patentabteilung Rosenbergsaustrasse 10 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | Application number, filing date | 01911661.5 | 20.02.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001EP01861 | Priority number, date | DE2000203705U | 29.02.2000 Original published format: DE 20003705 U | [2002/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0165018 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1259677 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1259677 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/26 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
E04B1/2604 (EP,US);
E04B2001/2652 (EP,US);
Y10T403/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG VON ZWEI ZUMINDEST ANNÄHERND RECHTWINKLIG ANEINANDER ANSCHLIESSENDEN HOLZBALKEN | [2002/48] | English: | INTERCONNECTION OF TWO WOOD BEAMS THAT ARE JOINED TOGETHER WHILE FORMING AN AT LEAST APPROXIMATELY RIGHT ANGLE | [2002/48] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE DE DEUX POUTRES EN BOIS SE RACCORDANT MUTUELLEMENT AU MOINS APPROXIMATIVEMENT A ANGLE DROIT | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 22.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.09.2006
10.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE Wieland, Heinz, Dipl. Bauing. ETH Parstolia 539 7212 Seewis / CH Opponent's representative Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang, et al, et al Dreiköniggasse 10 89073 Ulm / DE | 02
31.10.2006
09.11.2006
ADMISSIBLE HECO-Scharuben GmbH & Co. KG Dr. Kurt-Steim-Strasse 28 78713 Schramberg / DE Opponent's representative Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | 03
07.11.2006
17.11.2006
ADMISSIBLE ABC Verbindungstechnik GmbH & Co. KG Kölner Str. 71-77 58256 Ennepetal / DE Opponent's representative Zapf, Christoph Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | 04
07.11.2006
17.11.2006
ADMISSIBLE Bierbach GmbH & Co KG Befestigungstechnik Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 2 59425 Unna / DE Opponent's representative Tarvenkorn, Oliver, et al, et al Dr. Hoffmeister & Tarvenkorn Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.09.2006
10.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE Wieland, Heinz, Dipl. Bauing. ETH Parstolia 539 7212 Seewis / CH Opponent's representative Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang, et al, et al Dreiköniggasse 10 D-89073 Ulm / DE | ||
02
31.10.2006
09.11.2006
ADMISSIBLE HECO-Scharuben GmbH & Co. KG Dr. Kurt-Steim-Strasse 28 78713 Schramberg / DE Opponent's representative Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | |||
03
07.11.2006
ABC Verbindungstechnik GmbH & Co. KG Kölner Str. 71-77 58256 Ennepetal / DE Opponent's representative Zapf, Christoph Patentanwälte Dr. Solf und Zapf Postfach 13 01 13 42028 Wuppertal / DE | |||
04
07.11.2006
Bierbach GmbH & Co KG Befestigungstechnik Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 2 59425 Unna / DE Opponent's representative Tarvenkorn, Oliver, et al, et al Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | |||
Former [2006/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.09.2006
10.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE Wieland, Heinz, Dipl. Bauing. ETH Parstolia 539 7212 Seewis / CH Opponent's representative Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang, et al, et al Dreiköniggasse 10 D-89073 Ulm / DE | 15.12.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.05.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.02.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/38] | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.02.2006 | TR | 08.02.2006 | LU | 20.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | GR | 09.05.2006 | PT | 10.07.2006 | IE | 20.02.2007 | DK | 28.02.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | TR | 08.02.2006 | |
LU | 20.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
IE | 20.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | MC | 28.02.2006 | |
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
IE | 20.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | MC | 28.02.2006 | |
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
IE | 20.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | MC | 28.02.2006 | |
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/45] | MC | 28.02.2006 | |
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | IT | 08.02.2006 | |
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | MC | 28.02.2006 | |
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | MC | 28.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4981388 (BECKEN RICHARD H [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 20 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 35; figures 1-4 * [A] 1; | [XY]DE19724284 (SFS IND HOLDING AG [CH]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 5; | [A]DE29805784U (SFS IND HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1* page 3, line 23 - page 5, line 7; figure 1 * | by applicant | FR865513 | DE706759 |