EP1272692 - ELECTRO-PLATING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDAO Limited Unit E2 Welland Business Park Valley Way Market Harborough, Leicestershire LE16 7PS / GB | [2003/35] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states Technology Development Associate Operations Limited Unit E2 Welland Business Park Valley Way Market Harborough, Leicestershire LE16 7PS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOWE, John Michael 7 The Heights Market Harborough Leicestershire LE16 8BQ / GB | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2010/02] |
Former [2003/02] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01911883.5 | 13.03.2001 | [2003/02] | WO2001GB01087 | Priority number, date | GB20000005886 | 13.03.2000 Original published format: GB 0005886 | [2003/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0168949 | Date: | 20.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1272692 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/08, C25D5/02 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
C25D5/02 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/08 (EP,KR,US);
C25D17/005 (EP,KR,US);
C25D17/10 (EP,KR,US);
C25D17/12 (EP,KR,US);
C25D21/12 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/611 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROPLATTIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2003/02] | English: | ELECTRO-PLATING APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2003/02] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE DEPOT ELECTROLYTIQUE | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 15.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/14] | 30.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2006 | 31.03.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2007 | 31.03.2008 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2008 | 31.03.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0766345 ; | [XA]JPH07109599 ; | [XA]GB1405670 (CII HONEYWELL BULL) [X] 1,2,10,11,17,18,26,27 * page 1, line 85 - page 2, line 12 * * page 2, lines 58-65 * * page 3, lines 23-30,52-83 * * figure - * [A] 8,24; | [A]JPH04311591 ; | [A]US3334028 (POLICHETTE JOSEPH N) [A] 1,4,5,7,8,10,11,17,20-23,25,26 * column 1, lines 17-29 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 54 *; | [A]JPH08100296 ; | [A]JPS5996289 ; | [A]JPH02101189 ; | [A]JPS63140099 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 1995, no. 06, & JP07066345 A 19950310 (CHICHIBU FUJI:KK) [X] 1-10,12,17-26,28 * abstract * * figure - * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 07, & JP07109599 A 19950425 (NEC CORP) [X] 1,4-9,17,20-25 * abstract * * figure - * [A] 2,3,13,18,19,29 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930323), vol. 017, no. 142, Database accession no. (C - 1038), & JP04311591 A 19921104 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [A] 1,4-11,17,20-27 * abstract * * figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, & JP08100296 A 19960416 (SHIBAURA ENG WORKS CO LTD) [A] 1,4,9-11,17,20,25-27 * abstract * * figure 17 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840927), vol. 008, no. 212, Database accession no. (C - 244), & JP59096289 A 19840602 (SONITSUKUSU:KK) [A] 1,4,9-11,17,20,25-27 * abstract * * figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900629), vol. 014, no. 304, Database accession no. (C - 0734), & JP02101189 A 19900412 (L DABURU II:KK) [A] 2,3,5-7,9,11,18,19,21-23,25,27 * abstract * * figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881021), vol. 012, no. 398, Database accession no. (C - 538), & JP63140099 A 19880611 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [A] * the whole document * |