EP1276671 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING TABLETS FROM BLISTER PACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wright, Fenn & Co. Ltd. 1 Carlton House, 75 Kew Green Richmond Surrey TW9 3AH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states Wright, Fenn & Co. Ltd. 1 Carlton House, 75 Kew Green Richmond, Surrey TW9 3AH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fenn, David John 1 Carlton House, 75 Kew Green Richmond Surrey, TW9 3AH / GB | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | Watkins, Rosalind Philippa Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | Watkins, Rosalind Philippa Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 01912015.3 | 22.03.2001 | [2003/04] | WO2001GB01250 | Priority number, date | GB20000007471 | 29.03.2000 Original published format: GB 0007471 | [2003/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0172589 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1276671 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1276671 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65B69/00 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
B65B69/0058 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1052 (EP,US);
Y10T156/12 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1961 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTFERNEN VON TABLETTEN AUS BLISTERPACKUNGEN | [2003/04] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING TABLETS FROM BLISTER PACKS | [2003/04] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ENLEVEMENT DE COMPRIMES A PARTIR DE PLAQUETTES | [2003/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 20.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.05.2004 | CH | 19.05.2004 | FI | 19.05.2004 | LI | 19.05.2004 | TR | 19.05.2004 | DK | 19.08.2004 | GR | 19.08.2004 | SE | 19.08.2004 | PT | 19.10.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2006/51] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
CH | 19.05.2004 | ||
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
TR | 19.05.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
CH | 19.05.2004 | ||
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
CH | 19.05.2004 | ||
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 19.05.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 19.05.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 19.05.2004 | |
LI | 19.05.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 19.05.2004 | |
LI | 19.05.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3744214 (MARTELL G, et al) [A] 1,2,31 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 51; figure - *; | [A]US4158411 (HALL DOUGLAS C, et al) [A] 1,31 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 58; figure - *; | [A]US4702788 (OKUI TOKUJIRO [JP]); | [A]EP0443502 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,31 * column 14, line 42 - column 17, line 55; figure - *; | [A]US5906701 (SMYTHE CRAIG R [US]) [A] 1,2,31 * column 10, line 2 - column 12, line 38; figure - * |