EP1193665 - BLOCK ENCRYPTION DEVICE USING AUXILIARY CONVERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 3-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2012/17] |
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Telegraph & Telephone Co. Ltd. 3-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | |||
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Telegraph & Telephone Co. Ltd. 3-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | |||
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Telegraph & Telephone Co. Ltd. 3-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUI, Mitsuru, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
TOKITA, Toshio, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
NAKAJIMA, Junko, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
KANDA, Masayuki, c/o Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 05 /
MORIAI, Shiho, c/o Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 06 /
AOKI, Kazumaro, c/o Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2012/18] |
Former [2012/17] | 01 /
MATSUI, Mitsuru, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
TOKITA, Toshio, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKAJIMA, Junko, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
04 /
KANDA, M., c/o Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | |||
05 /
MORIAI, S., c/o Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | |||
06 /
AOKI, K., c/o Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | |||
Former [2011/49] | 01 /
MATSUI, Mitsuru, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
TOKITA, Toshio, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKAJIMA, Junko, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
04 /
KANDA, M., c/o Nipon Telegraph and Telephone Co. 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome,Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | |||
05 /
MORIAI, S., c/o Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Co. 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | |||
06 /
AOKI, K., c/o Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corp. 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | |||
Former [2002/14] | 01 /
MATSUI, Mitsuru, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
TOKITA, Toshio, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKAJIMA, Junko, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
04 /
KANDA, M., c/o Nipon Telegraph and Telephone Co. 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome,Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | |||
05 /
MORIAI, S., c/o Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Co. 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | |||
06 /
AOKI, K., c/o Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corp. 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/14] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01912172.2 | 08.03.2001 | [2002/14] | WO2001JP01796 | Priority number, date | JP20000064614 | 09.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000064614 | [2002/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0167425 | Date: | 13.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1193665 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193665 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1193665 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.09.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/06 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
H04L9/0625 (EP,US);
G09C1/00 (KR);
H04L2209/122 (EP,US);
H04L2209/125 (EP,US);
H04L2209/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/14] | G09C1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/14] | Title | German: | BLOCKVERSCHLÜSSELUNGSEINRICHTUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON HILFSUMWANDLUNGEN | [2002/14] | English: | BLOCK ENCRYPTION DEVICE USING AUXILIARY CONVERSION | [2002/14] | French: | SYSTEME DE CHIFFRAGE DE BLOCS UTILISANT LA CONVERSION AUXILIAIRE | [2002/14] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2001 | Translation filed | 07.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 12.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06010073.2 / EP1686719 | EP06010074.0 / EP1686720 | EP06010075.7 / EP1686721 | EP06010076.5 / EP1689113 | EP06010077.3 / EP1689114 | EP06010078.1 / EP1686722 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.02.2012 | TR | 15.02.2012 | IE | 08.03.2012 | LU | 08.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | GR | 16.05.2012 | PT | 15.06.2012 | AT | 11.07.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
TR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
AT | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
AT | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
AT | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | GR | 16.05.2012 | |
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | GR | 16.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - MATSUI M, "New block encryption algorithm MISTY", FAST SOFTWARE ENCRYPTION. 4TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, FSE '97 PROCEEDINGS SPRINER-VERLAG BERLIN, GERMANY, (1997), ISBN 3-540-63247-6, pages 54 - 68, XP002367857 [A] 1-3,20,28-30,33 * abstract * * page 54, line 1 - page 56, line 7 * * page 58, line 1 - page 63, line 8 * * figures A,B,E * | [A] - KANDA M ET AL, "E2-a new 128-bit block cipher", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON FUNDAMENTALS OF ELECTRONICS, COMMUNICATIONS AND COMPUTER SCIENCES INST. ELECTRON. INF. & COMMUN. ENG JAPAN, (200001), vol. E83-A, no. 1, ISSN 0916-8508, pages 48 - 59, XP002367858 [A] 1-3,20,28-30,33 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO9709705 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al); | [X]JPH09269727 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [X]JPH1152849 (NEC CORP); | [Y] - FUMIHIKO SANO ET AL., "Kakucho feistel gata angou kei ni okeru random kansuu ichi to shoumei kanou anzensei no kankei ni tsuite", 1997 NEN, ANGOU TO JOHO SECURITY SYMPOSIUM, SCIS97-24C, (19970131), pages 1 - 15, XP002942208 | [Y] - Applied cryptography, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1995), XP002942209 [Y] * page 336 - page 339 * | [XP] - KAZUMARO AOKI ET AL., "128 Bit block angou camellia", DENSHI JOHO TSUUSHIN GAKKAI GIJUTSU KENKYU HOKOKU (ISEC2000-73, (20000518), vol. 100, no. 76, pages 47 - 75, XP002942210 | [XP] - KAZUMARO AOKI ET AL., "128 Bit block angou camellia no jissou hyouka", DENSHI JOHO TSUSSHIN GAKKAI GIJUTSU KENKYU HOKOKU (ISEC2000-73), (20000922), vol. 100, no. 324, pages 131 - 138, XP002942211 | by applicant | - "New block encryption algorithm MISTY", MATSUI M, FAST SOFTWARE ENCRYPTION. 4TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, FSE '97 PROCEEDINGS, SPRINGER-VERLAG BERLIN, (1997), pages 54 - 68 |