EP1179895 - ARRAY ANTENNA BASE STATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2002/07] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAMATSU, Katsuhiko 2-56-14-1212, Kinugasasakae-cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 238-0031 / JP | 02 /
KATO, Osamu 5-45-G302, Shonantakatori Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 237-0066 / JP | [2002/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01912344.7 | 14.03.2001 | [2002/07] | WO2001JP02001 | Priority number, date | JP20000078410 | 21.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000078410 | [2002/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0171944 | Date: | 27.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1179895 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1179895 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.09.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/10, H04B7/08, H04B7/06, H04B10/12, H01Q3/26 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
H04W24/02 (EP,US);
H01Q1/246 (EP,US);
H01Q3/26 (EP,US);
H04B7/04 (EP,US);
H04W88/085 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/07] | H04B7/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BASISSTATION MIT GRUPPENANTENNE | [2007/07] | English: | ARRAY ANTENNA BASE STATION APPARATUS | [2002/07] | French: | APPAREIL DE STATION DE BASE A ANTENNE-RESEAU | [2002/07] |
Former [2002/07] | BASISSTATIONSGERÄT MIT GRUPPEN ANTENNA | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2001 | Translation filed | 20.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/07] | 08.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0843380 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 2, line 16 - line 40 * * column 5, line 7 - line 39 * * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 4 * * figures 2,4-6 *; | [Y]DE3441462 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4-7 * page 2, line 25 - line 35 * * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 6 * * page 4, line 30 - page 6, line 22 * * page 9, line 35 - page 10, line 3 * * page 11, line 10 - line 15 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US5982327 (VOOK FREDERICK WERNER [US], et al) [Y] 1,3 * column 1, line 40 - line 50 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US5339184 (TANG DOUGLAS D [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 5, line 14 - line 19 * * figures 3A,4B,7 * | International search | [Y]JPH10502504 ; | [Y]JPH11215543 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH0677865 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JPH11261474 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH10336149 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |