EP1263905 - CURABLE FILM-FORMING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | [2002/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURGMAN, John, W. 3007 East Ridge Drive Gibsonia, PA 15044 / US | 02 /
MARTIN, David, C. 155 Meadowbrook Drive Bethel Park, PA 15102 / US | 03 /
KILIC, Soner 4907 Ottawa Court Gibsonia, PA 15044 / US | 04 /
VALENTA, Jane, N. 7437 Ben Hur Street Pittsburgh, PA 15208 / US | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 01913216.6 | 01.03.2001 | [2002/50] | WO2001US06614 | Priority number, date | US20000524830 | 14.03.2000 Original published format: US 524830 | [2002/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0168782 | Date: | 20.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1263905 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09D201/10, C09D201/06 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
C08G18/6295 (EP,KR,US);
C09D133/04 (KR);
C09D167/00 (KR);
C09D175/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09D201/025 (EP,KR,US);
C09D201/10 (EP,KR,US);
C09D7/63 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D175/04, C08L2666/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2002/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÄRTBARE FILMBILDUNGSZUSAMMENSEZUNG | [2002/50] | English: | CURABLE FILM-FORMING COMPOSITION | [2002/50] | French: | COUCHE DE FINITION POSSEDANT DES QUALITES ADHESIVES AMELIOREES | [2002/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 18.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5208285 (BOYCE CLARKE A [CA], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,9 *; | [X]US5972422 (HARMON HERBERT L [US]) [X] 1 * column 8, line 3; claims 1,15 *; | [X]EP0432921 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1,8 * examples 3,4,8,9; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0710676 (BASF CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7 * page 4, line 46 *; | [X]EP0767187 (BASF CORP [US]) [X] 1 * column 16, line 40 *; | [PX]EP0995778 (BASF CORP [US]) [PX] 1-5,7 * page 6, line 9 * |