EP1169560 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING CYLINDER-INDIVIDUAL DIFFERENCES OF A CONTROLLED VARIABLE IN A MULTICYLINDER INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2002/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESS, Werner Zorndorfer Strasse 23 70499 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
RIES-MUELLER, Klaus Heinsheimer Strasse 47 74906 Bad Rappenau / DE | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2004/19] |
Former [2004/01] | Grosse, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing., et al Gleiss & Grosse Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01913530.0 | 24.01.2001 | [2002/02] | WO2001DE00272 | Priority number, date | DE2000106161 | 11.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10006161 | [2002/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0159282 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1169560 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1169560 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/14, F02D33/02 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
F02D41/0085 (EP,US);
F02D35/023 (EP,US);
F02D41/0002 (EP,US);
F02D13/0207 (EP,US);
F02D2041/001 (EP,US);
F02D41/1497 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2004/36] |
Former [2002/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG ZYLINDERINDIVIDUELLER UNTERSCHIEDE EINER STEUERGRÖSSE BEI EINER MEHRZYLINDRIGEN BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2002/02] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING CYLINDER-INDIVIDUAL DIFFERENCES OF A CONTROLLED VARIABLE IN A MULTICYLINDER INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2002/02] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETERMINER DES DIFFERENCES DE VARIABLE DE REFERENCE, PROPRES AUX CYLINDRES, DANS UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A PLUSIEURS CYLINDRES | [2002/02] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 16.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPS6321338 ; | [YA]EP0833043 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 2,10 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 21 * * column 2, line 58 - line 17 * [A] 1,3-9,11,12; | [X]JPH1037727 ; | [A]US5515828 (COOK JEFFREY A [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column A * * column 2, line 1 - line 4 * * column 6, line 28 - line 65 * * figures 5,7 *; | [PX]DE19859018 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PX] 1-5,9-11 * column 1, line 60 - column 64 * * column 3, line 10 - line 38 * * column 3, line 59 - line 67 * * claims 1,5-7 *; | [PX]WO0104465 (RENAULT [FR], et al) [PX] 1-5,9-11 * column A * * page 3, line 1 - line 3 * * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 11 * * page 9, line 9 - line 13 *; | [DA]EP0140065 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [DA]DE19828279 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] * column W * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880628), vol. 012, no. 227, Database accession no. (M - 713), & JP63021338 A 19880128 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,9 * abstract * [Y] 2,10 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10037727 A 19980210 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,9 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0140065 | DE19828279 |