EP1260102 - METHOD FOR STATUS INQUIRY OF AT LEAST ONE CONNECTION FOR A USER GROUP AND/OR COMMUNICATION TRANSMISSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.01.2007 [2007/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Bernd Ammerstr. 7F 81479 München / DE | [2002/48] | Application number, filing date | 01913694.4 | 19.02.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001DE00646 | Priority number, date | DE2000110462 | 03.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10010462 | [2002/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0165866 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1260102 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
H04Q3/0016 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13072 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13173 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13175 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13176 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1322 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2002/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZUSTANDSABFRAGE WENIGSTENS EINES ZU EINER TEILNEHMERGRUPPE ZUGEORDNETEN ANSCHLUSSES UND/ODER KOMMUNIKATIONSENDEINRICHTUNG | [2002/48] | English: | METHOD FOR STATUS INQUIRY OF AT LEAST ONE CONNECTION FOR A USER GROUP AND/OR COMMUNICATION TRANSMISSION DEVICE | [2002/48] | French: | PROCESSUS DE REQUETE D'ETAT D'AU MOINS UNE CONNEXION ET/OU D'UN TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION ASSOCIE A UN GROUPE D'UTILISATEURS | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 04.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/05] | 18.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH11346264 ; | [X]US4313036 (JABARA MICHAEL D, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 7 * * claims 1-3 *; | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000330), vol. 2000, no. 03, & JP11346264 A 19991214 (NEC CORP) [X] 1-7 * abstract * [A] 8 | [X] - EBNER ET AL, "CCIS: A SIGNALING SYSTEM FOR THE STORED PROGRAM CONTROLLED NETWORK", BELL LABORATORIES RECORD, (19790201), vol. 57, no. 2, pages 53 - 59, XP000821131 [X] 1-3 * page 57, column R - page 59, column L * | [A] - CRAVEUR J ET AL, "UN RESEAU SEMAPHORE ADAPTE A L'INTRODUCTION DE LA TELEMATIQUE DANS LES RESEAUX ANALOGIQUES ET NUMERIQUES", ONDE ELECTRIQUE,EDITIONS CHIRON S.A., PARIS, FR, (198210), vol. 62, no. 10, ISSN 0030-2430, pages 54 - 60, XP000843740 [A] 1 * paragraph [02.4] * |