EP1179109 - LOCK FOR A VEHICLE DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brose Schliesssysteme GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Strasse 42 42369 Wuppertal / DE | [2003/41] |
Former [2002/07] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUNST, Frank Schafhorst 50 59399 Olfen / DE | 02 /
FROHNE-BRINKMANN, Norbert Ahornweg 2 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | 03 /
BERGER, Rainer, Josef August-Brauer-Weg 19 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2002/07] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2002/51] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01913724.9 | 27.02.2001 | [2002/07] | WO2001DE00735 | Priority number, date | DE20001010809 | 08.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10010809 | [2002/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0166889 | Date: | 13.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1179109 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1179109 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/32, E05B47/00 | [2002/07] | CPC: |
E05B81/14 (EP);
E05B81/46 (EP);
E05B81/90 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2002/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | KRAFTFAHRZEUG-TÜRSCHLOSS | [2002/07] | English: | LOCK FOR A VEHICLE DOOR | [2002/07] | French: | SERRURE DE PORTIERE DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2002/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 30.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2320943 (CHEVALIER JOHN PHILLIP [GB]) [A] 1-5,8,9,11,13-15,17-22 * page 53, line 3 - line 22; figures 3,49,50 *; | [A]US5088347 (WANLASS BERT R [US]) [A] 1,7,12 * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 20; figures 1-9 *; | [A]EP0828049 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 26; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE19614112 |