EP1261978 - EMERGENCY SHUTDOWN KEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moeller GmbH Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11 53115 Bonn / DE | [2002/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURS, Marc Sudetenweg 60 50858 Köln / DE | 02 /
WIESE, Arthur Unter der Windmühle 63 53332 Bornheim / DE | [2002/49] | Application number, filing date | 01913844.5 | 02.03.2001 | [2002/49] | WO2001EP02371 | Priority number, date | DE2000111624 | 10.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10011624 | [2002/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0169617 | Date: | 20.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1261978 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1261978 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/02 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
H01H3/022 (EP);
H01H13/023 (EP);
H01H2003/024 (EP);
H01H2003/0246 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Title | German: | NOTAUS-TASTE | [2002/49] | English: | EMERGENCY SHUTDOWN KEY | [2002/49] | French: | BOUTON D'ARRET D'URGENCE | [2002/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 14.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.01.2008 | DK | 02.01.2008 | FI | 02.01.2008 | GB | 02.01.2008 | IE | 02.01.2008 | NL | 02.01.2008 | TR | 02.01.2008 | AT | 02.03.2008 | LU | 02.03.2008 | BE | 31.03.2008 | CH | 31.03.2008 | LI | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | SE | 02.04.2008 | GR | 03.04.2008 | ES | 13.04.2008 | PT | 02.06.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
TR | 02.01.2008 | ||
AT | 02.03.2008 | ||
LU | 02.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
AT | 02.03.2008 | ||
LU | 02.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
AT | 02.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | DK | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | DK | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 02.01.2008 | |
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 02.01.2008 | |
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | NL | 02.01.2008 | |
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 02.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4013856 (JOSS ROGER V, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3207725 (METZENAUER & JUNG GMBH [DE]) [A] 2* page 9, paragraph L - page 10, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]DE9306074U (KLOECKNER MOELLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 2; figure 2 *; | [A]US5408061 (MARTIN ADOLF H [US]) [A] 2 * column 3, paragraph L - column 4, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * |