EP1274549 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR HANDLING ELONGATED TIMBER ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. Gunnarssons Verkstads AB Box 64 340 30 Vislanda / SE | [2003/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUNNARSSON, Cenneth Växjövägen S-340 30 Vislanda / SE | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Andersson, Per-Olof AWAPATENT AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | Andersson, Per-Olof AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 01914276.9 | 09.03.2001 | [2003/03] | WO2001SE00495 | Priority number, date | SE20000000807 | 13.03.2000 Original published format: SE 0000807 | [2003/03] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0168330 | Date: | 20.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1274549 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B27B31/00 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
B65G57/18 (EP);
B65G57/24 (EP);
B65G2201/0282 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON LÄNGLICHEN HOLZTEILEN | [2003/03] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR HANDLING ELONGATED TIMBER ELEMENTS | [2003/03] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION D'ELEMENTS DE BOIS D'OEUVRE | [2003/03] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2001 | Translation filed | 07.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 07.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 16.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/45] | 03.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4067455 |