EP1268627 - CO-CONTINUOUS INTERCONNECTING CHANNEL MORPHOLOGY POLYMER HAVING CONTROLLED GAS TRANSMISSION RATE THROUGH THE POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSP Technologies, Inc. 1030 Riverfront Center P.O. Box 710 Amsterdam New York 12010 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states CSP Technologies, Inc. 1030 Riverfront Center P.O. Box 710 Amsterdam New York 12010 / US | ||
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states CSP Technologies Inc. 1030 Riverfront Center, PO Box 710 Amsterdam, NY 12010 / US | ||
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states CSP Technologies, Inc. 2039 McMillan Street Auburn, AL 36832 / US | ||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Capitol Specialty Plastics, Inc. 2039 McMillan Street Auburn, AL 36832 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEKAL, Ihab, M. 230 Round Hill Road Greenwich, CT 06831 / US | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Stevens, Ian Edward, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | Stevens, Ian Edward, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2003/01] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01914692.7 | 06.03.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001US07072 | Priority number, date | US20000186987P | 06.03.2000 Original published format: US 186987 P | US20000627630 | 28.07.2000 Original published format: US 627630 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0166625 | Date: | 13.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1268627 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.09.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/26, C08J9/28, C08L29/04 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
B01J20/28014 (EP,US);
B01D39/16 (EP,US);
B01J20/28026 (EP,US);
B01J20/28033 (EP,US);
B01J20/28042 (EP,US);
B65D81/264 (EP,US);
C08J9/26 (EP,US);
C08L23/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L29/04 (EP,US);
C08L69/00 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US);
F26B21/083 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (EP,US);
C08L2205/035 (EP,US);
C08L23/0853 (EP,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/02, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L23/02, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L23/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/22 (US,EP);
C08L23/10, C08L2666/22 (US,EP);
C08L29/04, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L29/04, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L29/04, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L69/00, C08L29/00 (EP,US);
C08L69/00, C08L71/00 (US,EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2003/01] | C08J9/26, C08J9/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | POLYMER MIT EINER MORPHOLOGIE AUS MIT- UND UNTEREINANDER VERBUNDENEN KANÄLEN MIT EINER KONTROLLIERTEN GASDURCHLÄSSIGKEIT | [2003/01] | English: | CO-CONTINUOUS INTERCONNECTING CHANNEL MORPHOLOGY POLYMER HAVING CONTROLLED GAS TRANSMISSION RATE THROUGH THE POLYMER | [2003/01] | French: | POLYMERE A MORPHOLOGIE DE CANAUX INTERCONNECTES CO-CONTINUS PRESENTANT UN TAUX REGLE DE TRANSMISSION DE GAZ A TRAVERS LE POLYMERE | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 30.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/27] | 16.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9732663 (CAPITOL VIAL INC [US]) [X] 1-14* page 20, line 2 - page 21, line 14; claims 1-10 *; | [X]WO9961856 (CAPITOL SPECIALTY PLASTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 11; claims 1-15 * * page 8, line 1 - page 8, line 9 *; | [PX]WO0017258 (CAPITOL SPECIALTY PLASTICS INC [US]) [PX] 1-14 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 6, line 4 - page 6, line 5; example 1; claims 1-12 *; | [PX]WO0016884 (CAPITOL SPECIALTY PLASTICS INC [US]) [PX] 1-14 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 5, line 1 - page 5, line 7 * * page 6, line 4 - page 6, line 9; example 1; claims 1-12 *; | [E]WO0160897 (CAPITOL SPECIALTY PLASTICS INC [US], et al) [E] 3,4 * page 1, paragraph 2; example 1; claim 1 * | International search | [A]US6124006 (HEKAL IHAB M [US]); | [A]US6174952 (HEKAL IHAB M [US], et al) |