EP1266090 - METHOD FOR HEADBOX CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Inc. 650 Ackerman Road Columbus, OH 43202 / US | [2002/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Shih-Chin 7160 Coventry Woods Drive Dublin, OH 43017 / US | 02 /
MURPHY, Timothy, F. 1056 Grandview Avenue Columbus, OH 43212 / US | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al David Keltie Associates Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 01914808.9 | 14.03.2001 | [2002/51] | WO2001US08115 | Priority number, date | US20000536107 | 24.03.2000 Original published format: US 536107 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0173198 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1266090 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1266090 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D21G9/00 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
D21G9/0027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2004/22] |
Former [2002/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STOFFAUFLAUFREGELUNG | [2002/51] | English: | METHOD FOR HEADBOX CONTROL | [2002/51] | French: | TECHNIQUE DE COMMANDE DE CAISSE DE TETE | [2002/51] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 14.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9927183 (VALMET AUTOMATION INC [FI], et al) [A] 1 * column W * |