EP1276528 - DEVICE FOR THE DOSED ADMINISTRATION OF AN INJECTABLE PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TecPharma Licensing AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH | [2004/46] |
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states Tecpharma Licensing AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH | ||
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states Disetronic Licensing AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALLY, Christoph 64 Avenue du Clos St Georges F-77600 Bussy St Georges / FR | 02 /
JOST, Stefan Hühnerbuehl 47 CH-3065 Bolligen / CH | [2003/12] |
Former [2003/04] | 01 /
BALLY, Christoph 112, rue de Charenton F-75012 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
JOST, Stefan Hühnerbuehl 47 CH-3065 Bolligen / CH | Application number, filing date | 01914944.2 | 03.04.2001 | [2003/04] | WO2001CH00212 | Priority number, date | DE2000118924 | 17.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10018924 | [2003/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0178811 | Date: | 25.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1276528 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1276528 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315, A61M5/20 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
A61M5/3158 (EP,US);
A61M5/31555 (EP,US);
A61M5/31563 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR DOSIERTEN VERABREICHUNG EINES INJIZIERBAREN PRODUKTS | [2003/04] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE DOSED ADMINISTRATION OF AN INJECTABLE PRODUCT | [2003/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'ADMINISTRATION DOSEE D'UN PRODUIT INJECTABLE | [2003/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 14.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 10.11.2004 | FR | 10.11.2004 | GB | 10.11.2004 | IE | 10.11.2004 | IT | 10.11.2004 | NL | 10.11.2004 | TR | 10.11.2004 | DK | 10.02.2005 | GR | 10.02.2005 | SE | 10.02.2005 | ES | 21.02.2005 | AT | 03.04.2005 | CY | 03.04.2005 | LU | 03.04.2005 | PT | 10.04.2005 | BE | 30.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
IT | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
AT | 03.04.2005 | ||
CY | 03.04.2005 | ||
LU | 03.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
AT | 03.04.2005 | ||
CY | 03.04.2005 | ||
LU | 03.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
AT | 03.04.2005 | ||
CY | 03.04.2005 | ||
LU | 03.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
AT | 03.04.2005 | ||
CY | 03.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
AT | 03.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
AT | 03.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/43] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
AT | 03.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
GB | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 10.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2750943 (MORRIS DANN) [A] 1 * column 3, line 43 - line 64 * * figure - *; | [A]CH364320 (HAUPTNER FA H [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 90 - line 106 * * figure 6 *; | [A]FR1528444 (FIRME ELIOS VANTINI DEGLI ERED) [A] 1,14* the whole document *; | [A]US3504673 (PARISI FRED) [A] 1 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 13 * * figure - *; | [A]CH682722 (ANDYVAL INC) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5865804 (BACHYNSKY NICHOLAS [US]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 31 - line 35 * * figure 14 *; | [A]US5975355 (CECALA ANN [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |