EP1171024 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ARTIFICIAL OCULAR LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WaveLight Laser Technologie AG Am Wolfsmantel 5 91058 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states Wavelight Laser Technologie AG Am Wolfsmantel 5 91058 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONITZKY, Christof Hersbrucker Strasse 1a 90542 Eckental / DE | 02 /
REINDL, Maximilian Imkerweg 14a 90562 Heroldsberg / DE | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01915269.3 | 16.02.2001 | [2002/03] | WO2001EP01746 | Priority number, date | DE2000106896 | 16.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10006896 | [2002/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0160240 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1171024 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/103 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
A61B3/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2002/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER KÜNSTLICHEN OKULAREN LINSE | [2002/03] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ARTIFICIAL OCULAR LENS | [2002/03] | French: | PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UNE LENTILLE OCULAIRE ARTIFICIELLE | [2002/03] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 15.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/10] | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5777719 (WILLIAMS DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9927334 (AUTONOMOUS TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [DA] 1-3 * claim 31 * | [AD] - LIANG J ET AL, "OBJECTIVE MEASUREMENT OF WAVE ABERRATIONS OF THE HUMAN EYE WITH THEUSE OF A HARTMANN-SHACK WAVE-FRONT SENSOR", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK,US, (199407), vol. 11, no. 7, pages 1949 - 1957, XP000955413 [AD] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/JOSAA.11.001949 | [DA] - HOWLAND H C ET AL, "SUBJECTIVE METHOD FOR THE MEASUREMENT OF MONOCHROMATIC ABERRATIONS OF THE EYE", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, (1977), vol. 67, no. 11, pages 1508 - 1518, XP000885263 [DA] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/JOSA.67.001508 |