EP1276701 - ETCHING PASTES FOR INORGANIC SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2012/49] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEIN, Sylke Auf dem Wingert 8 64380 Rossdorf / DE | 02 /
HEIDER, Lilia Lagerstrasse 37A 64560 Riedstadt / DE | 03 /
WIEGAND, Claudia Altheimweg 14 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
KÜBELBECK, Armin Augartenstrasse 45 64625 Bensheim / DE | 05 /
STOCKUM, Werner Waldstrasse 59 64354 Reinheim / DE | [2012/49] |
Former [2003/04] | 01 /
KLEIN, Sylke Auf dem Wingert 8 64380 Rossdorf / DE | ||
02 /
HEIDER, Lilia Lagerstrasse 37A 64560 Riedstadt / DE | |||
03 /
ZIELINSKI, Claudia Stormstrasse 15 64291 Darmstadt / DE | |||
04 /
KÜBELBECK, Armin Augartenstrasse 45 64625 Bensheim / DE | |||
05 /
STOCKUM, Werner Waldstrasse 59 64354 Reinheim / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/49] | Application number, filing date | 01915409.5 | 23.03.2001 | [2003/04] | WO2001EP03317 | Priority number, date | DE2000120817 | 28.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10020817 | DE2001101926 | 16.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10101926 | [2003/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0183391 | Date: | 08.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1276701 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1276701 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C03C15/00, C09K13/08 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
C03C15/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09K13/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/04] | Extension states | LT | 07.09.2002 | LV | 07.09.2002 | RO | 07.09.2002 | SI | 07.09.2002 | Title | German: | ÄTZPASTEN FÜR ANORGANISCHE OBERFLÄCHEN | [2003/04] | English: | ETCHING PASTES FOR INORGANIC SURFACES | [2003/04] | French: | PATES D'ATTAQUE CHIMIQUE POUR SURFACES INORGANIQUES | [2003/04] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 11.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 11.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2004 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.12.2012 | DK | 05.12.2012 | FI | 05.12.2012 | SE | 05.12.2012 | TR | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.03.2013 | AT | 23.03.2013 | IE | 23.03.2013 | LU | 23.03.2013 | BE | 31.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | PT | 05.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
AT | 23.03.2013 | ||
IE | 23.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
AT | 23.03.2013 | ||
IE | 23.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 23.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 23.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 05.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0665544 ; | [A]DD153360 (SCHICHT HEINZ, et al) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * page 4; example - *; | [A]US4578407 (AMABILE ROBERT N [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * column 2, line 20 - line 59 * * examples I,III *; | [X]EP0229915 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,9-14,19-21,23,24 * abstract * * column 2, line 8 - line 45 * * example - *; | [X]US4921626 (RHODENBAUGH THOMAS A [US]) [X] 1-7,9,10,12-14,17-21,23,24 * abstract * * column 1, line 27 - line 55 * * column 2, line 9 - line 12 *; | [X]WO9830652 (HENKEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9,10,12,13,15,23,24 * abstract * * page 3, line 7 - line 31 * * table 1 *; | [PX]WO0040518 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [PX] 1-6,9-15,17-21,23,24 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 14 * * page 2, line 8 - page 4, line 13 * * page 5, line 11 - line 14 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940615), vol. 018, no. 313, Database accession no. (C - 1212), & JP06065544 A 19940308 (HITACHI CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1,4,5,9,10,12,13,23,24 * abstract * | by applicant | - MONK D.J. ET AL, THIN SOLID FILMS, (1993), vol. 232, no. 1 | - BÜHLER J. ET AL., J. MICROMECH. MICROENG., (1997), vol. 7, no. R1 |