EP1282219 - PLATEN FOR FLAT LINEAR MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shinano Electronics Co., Ltd. 3967-29, Aza Minami-nishihara, Oaza Wada, Matsumoto-shi Nagano 390-1241 / JP | [2003/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOH, Masato 1460-10, Ohaza Mita Horigane-mura, Minamiazumi-gun, Nagano 3 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Kimihiko 4279-61, Nakaminowa Minowa-machi, Kamiina-gun, Nagano 399-46 / JP | 03 /
TAKEUCHI, Katsuhiko 3868-1, Ohaza Shimauchi Matsumoto-shi, Nagano 390-0851 / JP | [2003/06] | Representative(s) | Sunderland, James Harry, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Bürkleinstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | Sunderland, James Harry, et al HASELTINE LAKE PARTNERS Motorama Haus 502 Rosenheimer Strasse 30 81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01915869.0 | 27.03.2001 | [2003/06] | WO2001JP02519 | Priority number, date | JP20000140584 | 12.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000140584 | [2003/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0186787 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1282219 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02K41/03 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
H02K41/033 (EP,US);
H02K41/02 (KR);
H02K1/28 (EP,US);
H02K2201/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2003/06] | Title | German: | PLATTE FÜR EINEN FLACHEN LINEARMOTOR | [2003/06] | English: | PLATEN FOR FLAT LINEAR MOTOR | [2003/06] | French: | PLATINE POUR MOTEUR LINEAIRE PLAT | [2003/06] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2002 | Translation filed | 04.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2002 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 08.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/13] | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/13] | Request for further processing for: | 06.12.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 08.12.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.2004 | 31.03.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19631106 (BRANDSTETTER HEINZ PETER [AT]) [X] 1,22-24 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 64; figures 1,3 *; | [X]WO9818192 (DREIFKE GUENTER [DE], et al) [X] 1,25,26 * page 15, paragraph 3 - page 18, paragraph 3; figures 1,2,6,10-13 *; | [Y]JP01085562 ; | [Y]GB1439664 (FUJITSU LTD, et al) [Y] 1,22-26 * page 3, line 6 - line 38; figures 1A,3B,4 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890719), vol. 0133, no. 17, Database accession no. (E - 789), & JP01085562 A 19890330 (AMADA CO LTD) [Y] 1,22-26 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS6014679U ; | [A]JPS489204 ; | [A]JPH07231588 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH02299455 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPS5038413U ; | [A]JPS5038414U ; | [A]JPS6344685U |