EP1262075 - METHOD OF TRANSMITTING SERVICE INFORMATION, AND RADIO SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spyder Navigations L.L.C. 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2007/50] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VÄNTTINEN, Veijo Mustarinne 8 FIN-02770 Espoo / FI | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2002/49] | Brockman, Pertti Erik Kolster Oy Ab, P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 01917136.2 | 05.03.2001 | [2002/49] | WO2001FI00216 | Priority number, date | FI20000000509 | 06.03.2000 Original published format: FI 20000509 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0167661 | Date: | 13.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1262075 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1262075 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/24, // H04W76/02 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
H04W28/24 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/40 (EP,KR,US);
H04L69/24 (EP,KR,US);
H04W76/16 (KR);
H04W80/10 (KR);
H04W76/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/49] | H04Q7/20, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN VON DIENSTINFORMATIONEN UND FUNKSYSTEM | [2002/49] | English: | METHOD OF TRANSMITTING SERVICE INFORMATION, AND RADIO SYSTEM | [2002/49] | French: | PROCEDE D'EMISSION D'INFORMATION DE SERVICE ET SYSTEME RADIO | [2002/49] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 19.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 14.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10007195.0 / EP2237605 | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.07.2010 | BE | 14.07.2010 | CY | 14.07.2010 | DK | 14.07.2010 | FI | 14.07.2010 | IT | 14.07.2010 | NL | 14.07.2010 | SE | 14.07.2010 | TR | 14.07.2010 | GR | 15.10.2010 | ES | 25.10.2010 | PT | 15.11.2010 | IE | 05.03.2011 | LU | 05.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
IE | 05.03.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
IE | 05.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
NL | 14.07.2010 | Cited in | International search | [AP]US6151501 (BELKIN ANATOLY S [US], et al); | [AP]WO0078080 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) | Examination | US5613213 | WO9916266 |