EP1269680 - MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sepura plc Radio House St. Andrews Road Cambridge CB4 1GR / GB | [2008/23] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Sepura Limited Radio House, St. Andrews Road Cambridge CB4 1GR / GB | ||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Sepura Limited Radio House, St. Andrews Road Cambridge CB4 1GR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAYNE, Mark, Wentworth 5 St. James Close, Stretham Near Ely, Cambridgeshire CB6 3ND / GB | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Tothill, John Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Tothill, John Paul Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01917262.6 | 30.03.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001GB01451 | Priority number, date | GB20000007874 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: GB 0007874 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0176125 | Date: | 11.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1269680 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1269680 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/12 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H04W12/04 (EP);
H04W12/082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILFUNK-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2003/01] | English: | MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2003/01] | French: | SYSTEME MOBILE DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 13.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39] | Request for further processing for: | 17.10.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 17.10.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.10.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2004 | 31.03.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   05.09.2005 | 31.03.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.05.2006 | 31.03.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.10.2007 | CH | 17.10.2007 | CY | 17.10.2007 | DK | 17.10.2007 | FI | 17.10.2007 | LI | 17.10.2007 | TR | 17.10.2007 | GR | 18.01.2008 | LU | 30.03.2008 | IE | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
CY | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
LU | 30.03.2008 | ||
IE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
CY | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
IE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
IE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
IE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 17.10.2007 | |
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 17.10.2007 | |
LI | 17.10.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5164986 (BRIGHT MICHAEL W [US]) [A] 1-65 * abstract * * column 6, line 31 - column 7, line 5 * * column 12, line 16 - line 40 ** figures 1,12,13F,15K *; | [X] - ELLIS ET AL, "Key management engine techniques for sensitive or classified equipment initialization", MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1993. MILCOM '93. CONFERENCE RECORD. COMMUNICATIONS ON THE MOVE., IEEE BOSTON, MA, USA 11-14 OCT. 1993, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19931011), ISBN 0-7803-0953-7, pages 354 - 358, XP010142776 [X] 1-65 * page 354, column R, line 11 - line 26 * * page 355, column L, line 18 - line 28 * * page 355, column R, line 25 - page 356, column L, line 5 * * page 357, column L, line 39 - column R, line 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.1993.408646 |