EP1199696 - DISPLAY DEVICE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Prefecture 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEUCHI, Yukihisa, c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
TSUJI, Hiroyuki, c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 03 /
NANATAKI, Tsutomu, c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 04 /
OHWADA, Iwao, c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 05 /
TOYAMA, Nobutoshi, c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 06 /
NOGUCHI, Nobuchika, c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01917505.8 | 27.03.2001 | [2002/17] | WO2001JP02499 | Priority number, date | JP20000087624 | 27.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000087624 | [2002/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0173730 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1199696 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/40, G02B26/08 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
G02B26/004 (EP);
G09F9/30 (EP);
H04N9/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/17] | Title | German: | AUSZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2002/17] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF | [2002/17] | French: | AFFICHEUR ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2002/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2001 | Translation filed | 21.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 19.02.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10307542 ; | [A]JPH1173142 |