EP1207141 - SYNTHETIC QUARTZ GLASS MEMBER, PHOTOLITHOGRAPHY APPARATUS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PHOTOLITHOGRAPHY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | ||
Former [2002/21] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation Fuji Building, 2-3 Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Akiko, NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | 02 /
KOMINE, Norio, NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | 03 /
JINBO, Hiroki, NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [2002/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/21] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01917545.4 | 28.03.2001 | [2002/21] | WO2001JP02567 | Priority number, date | JP20000089108 | 28.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000089108 | [2002/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0172649 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1207141 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/06, H01L21/027, G03F7/20, G02B1/00 | [2002/21] | CPC: |
G03F7/70058 (EP,US);
G03F7/70958 (EP,KR,US);
C03C3/06 (EP,US);
G03F7/70191 (KR);
G03F7/70216 (EP,US);
G03F7/70558 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2002/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | SYNTHETISCHES QUARZGLASSELEMENT, PHOTOLITHOGRAPHISCHER APPARAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES PHOTOLITHOGRAPHISCHEN APPARATES. | [2002/21] | English: | SYNTHETIC QUARTZ GLASS MEMBER, PHOTOLITHOGRAPHY APPARATUS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PHOTOLITHOGRAPHY APPARATUS | [2002/21] | French: | ELEMENT DE VERRE DE SILICE SYNTHETIQUE, APPAREIL DE PHOTOLITHOGRAPHIE, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN APPAREIL DE PHOTOLITOGRAPHIE | [2002/21] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2001 | Translation filed | 28.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/46] | 10.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5719698 (HIRAIWA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 13, line 35 - column 14, line 12 * * column 15, line 51 - column 16, line 14; table 2 *; | [X]EP0835848 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 10 - page 13; examples 1-9; table 1 *; | [X]EP0908716 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0031]; figure 3 *; | [X]EP0921104 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0043] * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0943586 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0072]; figures 3,4 *; | [PX]EP1050754 (NIKON CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-3 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0090] *; | [X] - ARAUJO ET AL, "Induced Absorption in Silica", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, (19980701), vol. 3424, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 2 - 9, XP002296330 [X] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.323748 | [PX] - SMITH C ET AL, "ADVANCED LITHOGRAPHY NEEDS RIGOROUSLY TESTED FUSED SILICA GLASS", SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY, PENNWELL CORPORATION, TULSA, OK, US, (20010101), vol. 44, no. 1, ISSN 0038-111X, page 111,113/114,116, XP000976889 [PX] 1-3 * figure 2 * | International search | [Y]EP0691312 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]); | [Y]WO9852879 (HERAEUS QUARZGLAS [DE], et al); | [YP]EP1001314 (NIKON CORP [JP]); | [YP]JP3069562B | Examination | - KHOTIMCHENKO V S ET AL, "Determining the content of hydrogen dissolved in quartz glass using the methods of Raman scattering and mass spectrometry", JOURNAL OF APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY, NEW YORK,NY, US, (19870601), vol. 46, no. 6, doi:10.1007/BF00661243, ISSN 0021-9037, pages 632 - 635, XP009149953 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00661243 | by applicant | US5719698 | EP0835848 | EP0921104 |