EP1211296 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POWDER COATING COMPOSITION, POWDER COATING COMPOSITION, AND METHOD OF COATING FILM FORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC. 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | [2005/45] |
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC. 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | ||
For all designated states Liquid Gas Co., Ltd. 4-2-14, Kawara-machi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0048 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Katsuhiko 1-29-813, Kamino-cho Higashi Kishiwada-shi, Osaka 596-0047 / JP | 02 /
AGAWA, Tetsuro 240, Mozuumekita-cho 5-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8031 / JP | 03 /
SHINOHARA, Kouji 5-12-10, Jingu Nara-shi, Nara 631-0804 / JP | 04 /
KONISHI, Yoshitaka 1-90-1-314, Minamikyobate-cho Nara-shi, Nara 630-8141 / JP | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus, Weisert & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01917600.7 | 29.03.2001 | [2002/23] | WO2001JP02635 | Priority number, date | JP20000092314 | 29.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000092314 | [2002/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0172916 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1211296 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1211296 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/03, C08J3/12, C09D201/02, B05D1/36, B05D7/24 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
C09D5/03 (EP,US);
C09D5/032 (KR);
B05D1/02 (KR);
C09D5/033 (KR);
C09D7/20 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2002/23] | C09D201/00, C09D5/03, B05D1/36, B05D7/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITUNG EINER PULVRLACKZUSAMMENSETZUNG, PULVERLACKZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG DES BESCHICHTUNGSFILMS | [2002/23] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POWDER COATING COMPOSITION, POWDER COATING COMPOSITION, AND METHOD OF COATING FILM FORMATION | [2002/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COMPOSITION DE REVETEMENT EN POUDRE, COMPOSITION DE REVETEMENT EN POUDRE, ET PROCEDE DE FORMATION D'UN FILM DE REVETEMENT | [2002/23] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2001 | Translation filed | 23.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 22.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5208291 (WAMPRECHT CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,5 ** column 8, line 61 - column 9, line 8 *; | [A]EP0711586 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * page 6, column 10, line 51 - page 7, column 11, line 12 * | International search | [Y]JPH09255762 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK); | [Y]EP0849340 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]); | [Y]EP0962472 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) |