EP1273579 - METHOD FOR PURIFICATION OF CYCLIC ESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kureha Corporation 3-3-2, Nihonbashi-Hamacho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | [2006/13] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states KUREHA KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-9-11, Nihonbashi, Horidome-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EJIRI, Tetsuo 52-1, Inariduka Kubota Nakoso-machi, Fukushima 979-0141 / JP | 02 /
YAMANE, Kazuyuki 16-5, Nishikimigatsuka-machi, Onahama Iwaki-shi, Fukushima 971-8167 / JP | 03 /
OTAWARA, Kentaro 76-2, Eguri 2-chome, Nishiki-machi Iwaki-shi, Fukushima 974-8232 / JP | [2003/19] |
Former [2003/02] | 01 /
EJIRI, Tetsuo 16-1, Maehara, Nishiki-machi Iwaki-shi, Fukushima 974-8232 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMANE, Kazuyuki 16-5, Nishikimigatsuka-machi, Onahama Iwaki-shi, Fukushima 971-8167 / JP | |||
03 /
OTAWARA, Kentaro 76-2, Eguri 2-chome, Nishiki-machi Iwaki-shi, Fukushima 974-8232 / JP | Representative(s) | Uchida, Kenji, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Uchida, Kenji, et al S.A. Fedit-Loriot et Autres Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01917675.9 | 30.03.2001 | [2003/02] | WO2001JP02721 | Priority number, date | JP20000096713 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000096713 | [2003/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0172736 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1273579 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D319/12, B01D9/02, B01D9/00 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
C07D319/12 (EP,US);
B01D9/00 (EP,US);
B01D9/0004 (EP,US);
B01D9/004 (EP,US);
B01D9/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/02] | C07D319/12, B01D9/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR REINIGUNG EINES ZYKLISCHEN ESTERS | [2003/02] | English: | METHOD FOR PURIFICATION OF CYCLIC ESTER | [2003/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION D'ESTER CYCLIQUE | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2002 | Translation filed | 31.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2002 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 31.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 10.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 23.09.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/17] | 17.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/17] | Appeal following examination | 17.11.2009 | Appeal received No. T0227/10 | 21.01.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.09.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 06.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.09.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3770386 (HAYASHI Y, et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 19 * [A] 3-5; | [XA]GB2064976 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 124 - page 2, line 32; figure 3 * [A] 3-5; | [XA]EP0446381 (SAITOH SHIGERU [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 9 - column 6, line 16 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 12 * [A] 3-5; | [A]EP0789023 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5* abstract * | International search | [Y]EP0242181 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO9631506 (CHRONOPOL INC [US]) | by applicant | EP0261572 | DE1808939 | DE1234704 | US4727163 | JPH06172341 |