EP1191433 - CONTROL OF DECENTRALIZED PRINTING BY PRINTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWATA, Fumihiko c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
ASAKAWA, Masashi c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
SATO, Akihiro c/o A.I.SOFT, INC. 1-27, Chuoh 2-chome Matsumoto-shi, Nagano 390-0811 / JP | 04 /
MOCHIDA, Akira c/o A.I.SOFT, INC. 1-27, Chuoh 2-chome Matsumoto-shi, Nagano 390-0811 / JP | 05 /
TOGASHI, Koki c/o A.I.SOFT, INC. 1-27, Chuoh 2-chome Matsumoto-shi, Nagano 390-0811 / JP | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2002/13] | Winter, Brandl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 01917837.5 | 05.04.2001 | [2002/13] | WO2001JP02967 | Priority number, date | JP20000106535 | 07.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000106535 | JP20000107230 | 07.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000107230 | JP20000205550 | 06.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000205550 | [2002/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0177808 | Date: | 18.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1191433 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.10.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12, B41J29/38 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
G06F3/1247 (EP,US);
G06F3/1215 (EP,US);
G06F3/124 (EP,US);
G06F3/1245 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/13] | Title | German: | KONTROLLE VON DEZENTRALISIERTEM DRUCKEN DURCH DRUCKER | [2002/13] | English: | CONTROL OF DECENTRALIZED PRINTING BY PRINTERS | [2002/13] | French: | COMMANDE D'IMPRESSION DECENTRALISEE PAR DES IMPRIMANTES | [2002/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2001 | Translation filed | 13.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/18] | 07.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/18] | Divisional application(s) | EP10183743.3 / EP2267590 | EP10185194.7 / EP2270645 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPH0934660 (FUJITSU LTD); | [X]JPH1178178 (OKI DATA KK) | Examination | US5689755 | JPH10336376 | EP0982651 | US6256107 |