EP1254331 - ROTOR SEAL COMPRISING A PLEATED BAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM (Switzerland) Ltd Haselstrasse 16 5401 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states Alstom (Switzerland) Ltd Haselstrasse 16 5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URLICHS, Karl Klausener Winkel 18 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Hellwig, Tillmann Johannes, et al Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Hellwig, Tillmann, Dr., et al Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte, Postfach 103762 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01919274.9 | 12.02.2001 | [2002/45] | WO2001EP01539 | Priority number, date | DE2000106298 | 12.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10006298 | [2002/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0159338 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1254331 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1254331 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/32 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
F16J15/3292 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTORDICHTUNG MIT FALTENBAND | [2002/45] | English: | ROTOR SEAL COMPRISING A PLEATED BAND | [2002/45] | French: | JOINT DE ROTOR COMPORTANT UNE BANDE PLISSEE | [2002/45] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 29.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.01.2004 | FI | 14.01.2004 | GB | 14.01.2004 | IE | 14.01.2004 | TR | 14.01.2004 | LU | 12.02.2004 | BE | 28.02.2004 | MC | 28.02.2004 | DK | 14.04.2004 | GR | 14.04.2004 | ES | 25.04.2004 | PT | 14.06.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | CY | 14.01.2004 | |
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GB | 14.01.2004 | ||
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
TR | 14.01.2004 | ||
LU | 12.02.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GB | 14.01.2004 | ||
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
TR | 14.01.2004 | ||
LU | 12.02.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GB | 14.01.2004 | ||
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
LU | 12.02.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GB | 14.01.2004 | ||
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GB | 14.01.2004 | ||
IE | 14.01.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GB | 14.01.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GB | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/45] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GB | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 14.01.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2026627 (ROLLS ROYCE) [A] 1-3,7,9,10* page 1, line 100 - line 113; figure - * | by applicant | DE4403605 | EP0933567 | WO0003164 |