EP1175166 - TABLE, ESPECIALLY WORKING TABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akcam, Alev Bentestrasse 13 31311 Uetze / DE | [2002/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Einsel, Martin Patentanwälte Einsel & Kollegen Jasperallee 1a 38102 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Einsel, Martin Patentanwälte, Einsel & Kollegen, Jasperalle 1a 38102 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 01919357.2 | 28.02.2001 | [2002/05] | WO2001EP02259 | Priority number, date | DE2000109358 | 29.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10009358 | DE2000163774 | 21.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10063774 | DE2001109137 | 26.02.2001 Original published format: DE 10109137 | [2002/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0164074 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175166 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47B21/00 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
A47B21/0073 (EP);
A47B2021/0076 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TISCH, INSBESONDERE ARBEITSTISCH | [2002/05] | English: | TABLE, ESPECIALLY WORKING TABLE | [2002/05] | French: | TABLE, EN PARTICULIER TABLE DE TRAVAIL | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 10.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/53] | 27.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE9302737U (HOLZWERKSTATT ASTREIN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,14-16,22,24,25,30,31,33,34 * page 7, paragraph 6 - page 12, line L * * figure - * [Y] 17,19,20,32; | [Y]JPH04300502 (SHIMADZU CORP) [Y] 17,19,20,32 * abstract *; | [PX]EP0995369 (ABIERTI BVBA [BE]) [PX] 1-5,14-16,22,24,25,30-34 * column 4, line 3 - line 29 * * column 4, line 52 - column 8, line 28 * * column 9, line 34 - line 53 * * column 10, line 14 - column 11, line 10 * * figure - *; | [PX]DE19942421 (STOLZE AXEL [DE]) [PX] 1-5,14-16,22,24,25,30,31,33,34 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 1 * * claims 1,7 * * figures 2,3,13,21-26 *; | [A]DE8908844U (MAI PETER) [A] 1-34 * page 9, line 30 - page 13, line L * * figure - *; | [A]FR2733618 (AEROSTYLE [FR]) [A] 1-34 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * figure - *; | [A]EP0172762 (BREDY S A [FR]) [A] 1-34 * page 4, line 36 - page 5, line 25 * * page 6, line 25 - line 33 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4695104 (LEDERMAN ELSIE J [US]) [A] 1-34 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 45 * * figure - *; | [A]DE19825356 (STOLZE AXEL [DE]) [A] 1-34 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 37 * * figure - * | by applicant | DE29711427U | DE19820256 |