EP1268142 - SEVERING MACHINE FOR ARTICLES OF WEBLIKE MATERIAL HAVING A SHARPENING ZONE FOR THE BLADES SEPARATE FROM THE CUTTING ZONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FABIO PERINI S.p.A. Via per Mugnano 55100 Lucca / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states FABIO PERINI S.p.A. Via per Mugnano I-55100 Lucca / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BETTI, Giulio Via di Piaggia, 8 Vorno I-55060 Capannori / IT | 02 /
BENVENUTI, Angelo Via del Chiasso, 327 I-55100 Lucca / IT | 03 /
CHIOCCHETTI, Mario, Gioni Via di Tiglio, 612 Pieve di Compito I-55065 Capannori / IT | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci, Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 01919757.3 | 23.03.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001IT00143 | Priority number, date | IT2000FI00078 | 28.03.2000 Original published format: IT FI20000078 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0172484 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1268142 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1268142 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/22, B26D7/12 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
B26D7/12 (EP,US);
B26D7/22 (EP,KR,US);
B26D3/161 (EP,US);
B26D7/2621 (EP);
B26D2210/11 (EP);
Y10T83/242 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEMASCHINE FÜR BAHNFÖRMIGE MATERIALIEN MIT GETRENNTEM SCHÄRF- UND SCHNEIDEBEREICH FÜR DIE MESSER | [2003/01] | English: | SEVERING MACHINE FOR ARTICLES OF WEBLIKE MATERIAL HAVING A SHARPENING ZONE FOR THE BLADES SEPARATE FROM THE CUTTING ZONE | [2003/01] | French: | MACHINE DE DECOUPAGE DESTINEE A DES ARTICLES DE MATERIAUX DU TYPE EN BANDE EQUIPEE D'UNE ZONE D'AFFUTAGE DES LAMES LAQUELLE EST SEPAREE DE LA ZONE DE DECOUPAGE | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 02.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.05.2005 | CY | 11.05.2005 | FI | 11.05.2005 | IT | 11.05.2005 | TR | 11.05.2005 | DK | 11.08.2005 | PT | 19.10.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | BE | 11.05.2005 | |
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
IT | 11.05.2005 | ||
TR | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/36] | BE | 11.05.2005 | |
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
IT | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | BE | 11.05.2005 | |
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | BE | 11.05.2005 | |
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 11.05.2005 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4329895 (PERINI GUGLIELMO); | [AD]IT1103635 (PERINI FABIO [IT]); | [A]EP0677360 (PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE CO [US]) [A] 1,2,4,5,7,9 * column 3, line 11 - line 45; figure 7 *; | [DA]US5522292 (BIAGIOTTI GUGLIELMO [IT]) [DA] 2,10,11 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 7; figure 1 * * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 6 * |