EP1361243 - OXYTETRAMETHYLENE GLYCOL COPOLYMER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Fibers Corporation 3-23 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8205 / JP | [2010/44] |
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8205 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KODAMA, Tamotsu Voorstraat 103 2611 JM Delft / NL | 02 /
MINOURA, Haruyuki 629-87 Nishi-tomii, Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710- / JP | 03 /
TSUNEMATSU, Yoshiyuki 1063 Higashi-tomii, Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 71 / JP | 04 /
FUKUZONO, Toshihiko 18-15-104, Shimo-kodanaka 3-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211- / JP | 05 /
FURUBEPPU, Satoshi prime-Court 101, 33-15 Ayase 6-chome Adachi-Ku, Tokyo 120-0005 / JP | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2003/46] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 01919942.1 | 16.04.2001 | [2003/46] | WO2001JP03230 | Priority number, date | JP20010003810 | 11.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001003810 | JP20010003899 | 11.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001003899 | [2003/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02055586 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1361243 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1361243 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.07.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/20, C08G65/30, C08G65/28 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
C08G65/30 (EP,US);
C08G65/20 (EP,KR,US);
C08G65/2609 (EP,US);
C08G65/2696 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/46] | C08G65/20, C08G65/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OXYTETRAMETHYLENGLYKOL-COPOLYMER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2003/46] | English: | OXYTETRAMETHYLENE GLYCOL COPOLYMER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2003/46] | French: | COPOLYMERE D'OXYTETRAMETHYLENE GLYCOL ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2003/46] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2003 | Translation filed | 05.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 23.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.2010 | CY | 24.11.2010 | DK | 24.11.2010 | FI | 24.11.2010 | SE | 24.11.2010 | TR | 24.11.2010 | GR | 25.02.2011 | PT | 24.03.2011 | IE | 16.04.2011 | LU | 16.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.04.2011 | ||
LU | 16.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9961507 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0052] * * example - ** claims 1-7 * | International search | [Y]JPS61126134 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]JPH1025340 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JPH1087813 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JPH1087811 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) |