EP1261717 - MUTANT BACTERIAL STRAINS OF THE GENUS SPHINGONOMAS DEFICIENT IN PRODUCTION OF POLYHYDROXYBUTYRATE AND A PROCESS OF CLARIFICATION OF SPHINGANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CP Kelco U.S., Inc. 1313 North Market Street Wilmington, DE 19894-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states CP Kelco U.S., Inc. 1313 North Market Street Wilmington, DE 19894-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOWER, Stan 3276 Caminito Eastbluff, Apt. 101 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 02 /
BURKE, Ellen Apt. 23, 3051 Cowley Way San Diego, CA 92117 / US | 03 /
HARDING, Nancy 9038 Ellingham Street San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 04 /
PATEL, Yamini, N. 12258 Oakview Way San Diego, CA 92128-6303 / US | 05 /
SCHNEIDER, J., Carrie 2621 32nd Street San Diego, CA 92104 / US | 06 /
MEISSNER, Dagmar 1661 Beryl Street San Diego, CA 92109 / US | 07 /
MORRISON, Neil 12332 Briardale Way San Diego, CA 92128 / US | 08 /
BEZANSON, Ralph P.O. Box 636 Alpine, CA 91903 / US | [2002/51] |
Former [2002/49] | 01 /
BOWER, Stan 3276 Caminito Eastbluff, Apt. 101 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | ||
02 /
BURKE, Ellen Apt. 23, 3051 Cowley Way San Diego, CA 92117 / US | |||
03 /
HARDING, Nancy 9038 Ellingham Street San Diego, CA 92129 / US | |||
04 /
PATEL, Yamini, N. 8070 Los Sabalos Street San Diego, CA 92126 / US | |||
05 /
SCHNEIDER, J., Carrie 2621 32nd Street San Diego, CA 92104 / US | |||
06 /
MEISSNER, Dagmar 1661 Beryl Street San Diego, CA 92109 / US | |||
07 /
MORRISON, Neil 12332 Briardale Way San Diego, CA 92128 / US | |||
08 /
BEZANSON, Ralph P.O. Box 636 Alpine, CA 91903 / US | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01920204.3 | 02.03.2001 | [2002/49] | WO2001US07010 | Priority number, date | US20000186433P | 02.03.2000 Original published format: US 186433 P | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0164897 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1261717 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1261717 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/52, C12N9/00, C12N1/20, C12P7/62, C08B37/00, A23L1/00 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
C08B37/006 (EP,US);
A23L21/10 (EP,US);
A23L21/15 (EP,US);
A23L29/269 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
C12P19/04 (US);
C12P7/62 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Extension states | AL | 26.09.2002 | LT | 26.09.2002 | LV | 26.09.2002 | MK | 26.09.2002 | RO | 26.09.2002 | SI | 26.09.2002 | Title | German: | MUTANTE BAKTERIESTÄMME VOM GENUS SPHINGONOMAS DIE DEFIZIENT IN DER HERSTELLUNG VON POLYHYDROXYBUTYRATE SIND, UND VERFAHREN ZUR KLÄRUNG VON SPHINGANEN | [2002/49] | English: | MUTANT BACTERIAL STRAINS OF THE GENUS SPHINGONOMAS DEFICIENT IN PRODUCTION OF POLYHYDROXYBUTYRATE AND A PROCESS OF CLARIFICATION OF SPHINGANS | [2002/49] | French: | SOUCHES MUTANTES BACTERIENNES DU GENRE SPHINGOMONAS DEFICIENT DANS LA PRODUCTION DU POLYHYDROXYBUTYRATE, PROCEDE DE CLARIFICATION DE SPHINGANES ET COMPOSITIONS DESDITS SPHINGANES | [2002/49] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 15.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.05.2008 | CY | 07.05.2008 | TR | 07.05.2008 | GR | 08.08.2008 | PT | 07.10.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 07.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0473222 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [DX] 7,19-22,29-39 * the whole document *; | [A] - FUKUI ET AL, "Cloning and analysis of the poly(3- hydroxybutyrate -co-3-hydroxyhexanoate) biosynthesis genes of Aeromonas caviae", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199708), vol. 179, no. 15, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 4821 - 4830, XP002113257 | [ ] - FUKUI T, "Aeromonas caviae phaC gene for PHA synthase,complete cds.", EMBL, (19970821), XP002186560 |