EP1282916 - SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING EXTERIOR VEHICLE LIGHTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gentex Corporation 600 North Centennial Street Zeeland, MI 49464 / US | [2011/41] |
Former [2003/07] | For all designated states GENTEX CORPORATION 600 N. Centennial Zeeland, Michigan 49464 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAM, Joseph, S. 345 South Lakeshore Drive Holland, MI 49424 / US | 02 /
BECHTEL, Jon, H. 136 Sunrise Drive Holland, MI 49423 / US | 03 /
REESE, Spencer, D. 1710 Columbia Avenue Fort Wayne, IN 46805 / US | 04 /
ROBERTS, John, K. 1061 Plymouth Avenue, S.E. East Grand Rapids, MI 49506 / US | 05 /
TONAR, William, L. 40 Cheyenne Holland, MI 49424 / US | 06 /
POE, G., Bruce 3175 42nd Street Hamilton, MI 49419 / US | [2003/07] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/13] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/38] | Draper, Martyn John, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2003/07] | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01920575.6 | 20.03.2001 | [2003/07] | WO2001US08912 | Priority number, date | US20000528389 | 20.03.2000 Original published format: US 528389 | US20010800460 | 05.03.2001 Original published format: US 800460 | [2003/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0170538 | Date: | 27.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1282916 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1282916 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/08, B60Q1/14 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
B60Q1/18 (EP,US);
B60Q1/14 (KR);
B60Q1/085 (EP,US);
B60Q1/143 (EP,US);
B60Q1/2603 (EP,US);
G06V10/141 (EP,US);
G06V20/10 (EP,US);
G06V20/56 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/054 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/056 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/112 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/114 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/116 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/122 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/134 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/142 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/144 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/21 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/312 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/314 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/32 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/322 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/331 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/332 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/3321 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/333 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/334 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/337 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/41 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/42 (EP,US);
B60Q2400/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/07] | H01L27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/07] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG VON AUSSENLICHTERN VON FAHRZEUGEN | [2003/07] | English: | SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING EXTERIOR VEHICLE LIGHTS | [2003/07] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DES LUMIERES EXTERIEURES D'UN VEHICULE | [2003/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2002 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 16.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11009059.4 / EP2420408 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.11.2011 | BE | 16.11.2011 | CY | 16.11.2011 | DK | 16.11.2011 | FI | 16.11.2011 | TR | 16.11.2011 | GR | 17.02.2012 | ES | 27.02.2012 | PT | 16.03.2012 | IE | 20.03.2012 | LU | 20.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
IE | 20.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
IE | 20.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
IE | 20.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
IE | 20.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | GR | 17.02.2012 | |
PT | 16.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3844364 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 59 - column 7, line 52; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US5347261 (ADELL ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 35 - column 11, line 62; figures 1-17 *; | [A]WO9735743 (DONNELLY CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 4, line 10 - page 16, line 25; figures 1-12 *; | [A]US5715093 (SCHIERBEEK KENNETH L [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 18 - column 10, line 55; figures 1-9 *; | [A]WO9914943 (GENTEX CORP [US]) [A] 1-9* page 3, line 16 - page 54, line 19; figures 1-12 *; | [A]US5998929 (BECHTEL JON H [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 13, line 65 - column 37, line 11; figures 1-11 * | International search | [X]US5837994 (STAM JOSEPH SCOTT [US], et al); | [Y]US5877897 (SCHOFIELD KENNETH [US], et al) | by applicant | US5471515 | US5711889 | US5837994 | WO9914619 | US5956012 | US5990469 | US6130421 | US6469739 | US20010602919 | US20010491192 |