EP1268416 - 2-ALKYLIDENE-19-NOR-VITAMIN D COMPOUNDS AND THEIR THERAPEUTIC USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WISCONSIN ALUMNI RESEARCH FOUNDATION 614 North Walnut Street Madison, WI 53705-7365 / US | [2007/39] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states WISCONSIN ALUMNI RESEARCH FOUNDATION 614 North Walnut Street Madison, Wisconsin 53705-7365 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELUCA, Hector, F. 1809 Highway BB Deerfield, WI 53531 / US | 02 /
SICINSKI, Rafal, R. ul. Waszyngtona 33m. 150 PL-04-030 Warsaw / PL | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Benson, John Everett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Benson, John Everett, et al J. A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/24] | Benson, John Everett, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2003/01] | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01920897.4 | 29.03.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001US10317 | Priority number, date | US20000540686 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: US 540686 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0174766 | Date: | 11.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1268416 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1268416 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07C401/00, A61K31/59, A61P3/02, A61P3/14, A61P17/06, A61P35/00, A61P35/02 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
C07C401/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P5/18 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 2-ALKYLIDENE-19-NOR-VITAMIN D VERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNGEN | [2003/01] | English: | 2-ALKYLIDENE-19-NOR-VITAMIN D COMPOUNDS AND THEIR THERAPEUTIC USES | [2003/01] | French: | COMPOSES 2-ALKYLIDENE-19-NOR- DE LA VITAMINE D ET LEURS UTILISATIONS THERAPEUTIQUES | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 31.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.09.2007 | TR | 26.09.2007 | GR | 27.12.2007 | PT | 26.02.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | CY | 26.09.2007 | |
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | GR | 27.12.2007 | |
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | GR | 27.12.2007 | |
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/19] | GR | 27.12.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4851401 (DELUCA HECTOR F [US], et al) [Y] 1-30,39-42 * page 2, paragraph 2; examples 5,7,8 ** column 11, paragraph 2 *; | [XY]WO9841501 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US]) [X] 32-38,43 * the whole document * [Y] 1-30,39-42; | [Y]US5981780 (DELUCA HECTOR F [US]) [Y] 1-30,39-42 * column 4, lines 6-39 * * column 6, line 10 * * column 7, paragraph 1 * * column 9, paragraph L * * column 10, paragraph 2 *; | [XY] - SICINSKI ET AL, "New 1alpha-25-Dihydroxy-19-norvitamin D3 Compounds of High Biological Activity: Synthesis and Biological Evaluation of 2-Hydroxymethyl, 2-Methyl, and 2-Methylene Analogues", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON,US, (19981022), vol. 41, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4662 - 4674, XP002106465 [X] 31-38,43 * page 4663; figure 1; examples 6A,6B * * page 4668; table 1 * * page 4669, column 1, paragraph 2; table 2 * [Y] 1-30,39-42 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9802618 | [Y] - YANG, WEN ET AL, "20-Epi analogues of 1,25-Dihydroxyvitamin D3 are highly potent inducers of DRIP coactivator complex binding to the vitamin D3 receptor", J. BIOL. CHEM. (1999), 274(24), 16838-16845, XP002172427 [Y] 1-30,39-42 * page 16839, column 1, paragraph 1 * * compound MC1627; page 16843, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.24.16838 |