EP1269005 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONDUCTING A LEAKAGE TEST OF A TANK SYSTEM OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/47] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STREIB, Martin Hohenzollernstrasse 13 71665 Vaihingen / DE | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2006/51] |
Former [2005/51] | Jakelski, Joachim Otte & Jakelski Patentanwälte Mollenbachstrasse 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01921167.1 | 09.03.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001DE00883 | Priority number, date | DE2000113347 | 17.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10013347 | [2003/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0169073 | Date: | 20.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1269005 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1269005 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/08 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
F02M25/0809 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DICHTHEITSPRÜFUNG EINES TANKSYSTEMS EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2003/01] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONDUCTING A LEAKAGE TEST OF A TANK SYSTEM OF A VEHICLE | [2003/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR VERIFIER L'ETANCHEITE D'UN SYSTEME DE RESERVOIR D'UN VEHICULE | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 26.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5295472 (OTSUKA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8 * abstract * * column 33, line 19 - column 35, line 39 * [A] 3-5,7; | [XA]EP0589176 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,8 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,7; | [XA]EP0611674 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [X] 1,5,6,8 * abstract * * column 2, line 16 - column 5, line 47 *[A] 2-4,7; | [XAY]US5857447 (SHINOHARA SUSUMU [JP]) [X] 6,8 * abstract * * column 3, line 1 - line 29 * * column 4, line 14 - column 6, line 14 * * column 7, line 14 - line 57 * * column 7, line 65 - column 9, line 20 * [A] 1,2,4,5,7 [Y] 3; | [XAY]WO9937905 (SIEMENS CANADA LTD [CA]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * abstract * * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 16 * * page 7, line 35 - page 9, line 26 * * page 12, line 18 - page 17, line 32 * [A] 4 [Y] 3; | [XA]EP0952332 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,8 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,7 | by applicant | DE19636431 |