EP1268104 - METHOD AND MOULD FOR THE COUNTER GRAVITY CASTING IN SAND DIES WITH DIRECTIONAL SOLIDIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/01] | METHOD FOR THE UPHILL CASTING OF CAST PIECES IN SAND DIES WITH CONTROLLED SOLIDIFICATION | ||
[2003/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACTech GmbH Advanced Casting Technologies Giessereitechnologie Halsbrücker Strasse 51 09599 Freiberg / DE | [2003/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOIGT, Heiko Schlossstrasse 29 04523 Pegau / DE | 02 /
DEMARCZYK, Norbert Tharandter Strasse 6 01723 Grumbach / DE | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Borchard, Wolfgang Hartzstrasse 4 04129 Leipzig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Borchard, Wolfgang Grassistrasse 12 04107 Leipzig / DE | Application number, filing date | 01921182.0 | 09.03.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001DE00941 | Priority number, date | DE2000114591 | 27.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10014591 | [2003/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0172452 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1268104 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1268104 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B22D27/15, B22D15/02, B22D27/04 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
B22C9/103 (EP,US);
B22C9/106 (EP,US);
B22D15/02 (EP,US);
B22D27/045 (EP,US);
B22D27/15 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GIESSFORM ZUM STEIGENDEN GIESSEN IN SANDFORMEN MIT GERICHTETER ERSTARRUNG VON GUSSTEILEN | [2003/16] | English: | METHOD AND MOULD FOR THE COUNTER GRAVITY CASTING IN SAND DIES WITH DIRECTIONAL SOLIDIFICATION | [2003/16] | French: | PROCEDE ET MOULE DE COULEE PAR CONTRE GRAVITE DANS DES MOULES EN SABLE A SOLIDIFICATION DIRIGEE DE PIECES COULEES | [2003/16] |
Former [2003/01] | VERFAHREN ZUM STEIGENDEN GIESSEN IN SANDFORMEN MIT GERICHTETER ERSTARRUNG VON GUSSTEILEN | ||
Former [2003/01] | METHOD FOR THE UPHILL CASTING OF CAST PIECES IN SAND DIES WITH CONTROLLED SOLIDIFICATION | ||
Former [2003/01] | PROCEDE DE COULEE EN SOURCE DANS DES MOULES EN SABLE A SOLIDIFICATION DIRIGEE DE PIECES COULEES | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 10.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.08.2003 | FI | 27.08.2003 | IE | 27.08.2003 | TR | 27.08.2003 | GR | 27.11.2003 | PT | 27.01.2004 | LU | 09.03.2004 | MC | 31.03.2004 | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/51] | FI | 27.08.2003 | |
IE | 27.08.2003 | ||
TR | 27.08.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
PT | 27.01.2004 | ||
LU | 09.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 27.08.2003 | |
IE | 27.08.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
PT | 27.01.2004 | ||
LU | 09.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 27.08.2003 | |
IE | 27.08.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
PT | 27.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | FI | 27.08.2003 | |
IE | 27.08.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
PT | 27.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 27.08.2003 | |
IE | 27.08.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | FI | 27.08.2003 | |
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 27.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS57160565 ; | [X]DE3305839 (BUDERUS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,9 * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 9; figure . *; | [A]US4969505 (SANDERS GREGORY [US]) [A] 1* abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830106), vol. 007, no. 001, Database accession no. (M - 183), & JP57160565 A 19821002 (KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1-4,6,9 * abstract * |