EP1266311 - A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING INTERACTIVE QUESTION-BASED APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Codetoys Oy Innopoli 2, Tekniikantie 14 02150 Espoo / FI | [2003/03] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states Codeonline OY Ukonvaaja 2 A 02130 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÄMÄLÄINEN, Matti, c/o Codeonline Oy Ukonvaaja 2 A FIN-02130 Espoo / FI | 02 /
PRIHA, Ilkka, c/o Codeonline Oy Ukonvaaja 2 A FIN-02130 Espoo / FI | 03 /
YLI-KREKOLA, Juho, c/o Codeonline Oy Ukonvaaja 2 A FIN-02130 Espoo / FI | 04 /
KUGGE, Stephane, c/o Codeonline Oy Ukonvaaja 2 A FIN-02130 Espoo / FI | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Brax, Matti Juhani Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Brax, Matti Juhani Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 01921395.8 | 19.03.2001 | [2002/51] | WO2001FI00274 | Priority number, date | FI20000000637 | 17.03.2000 Original published format: FI 20000637 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0169436 | Date: | 20.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1266311 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
G09B7/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON INTERAKTIVEN FRAGEGESTÜTZTEN ANWENDUNGEN | [2002/51] | English: | A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING INTERACTIVE QUESTION-BASED APPLICATIONS | [2002/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR FOURNIR DES APPLICATIONS INTERACTIVES FONDEES SUR DES QUESTIONS | [2002/51] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 16.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 01.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/14] | 07.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.05.2004 | 31.03.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6012098 (BAYEH ELIAS N [US], et al); | [A]WO0045304 (OBJECT DESIGN INC [US]) |