EP1255406 - TRICK PLAY APPARATUS FOR DIGITAL STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/45] | TRICK PLAY METHOD FOR DIGITAL STORAGE MEDIUM | ||
[2006/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2007/06] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SENOH, Takanori 1-24-8, Higashinakaburi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0093 / JP | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01921806.4 | 11.04.2001 | [2002/45] | WO2001JP03115 | Priority number, date | JP20000120752 | 21.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000120752 | [2002/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0182607 | Date: | 01.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1255406 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1255406 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/93, H04N5/76, H04N5/907, H04N5/783 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
H04N5/783 (EP,US);
G11B27/005 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/61 (EP,US);
G11B2220/90 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/107 (EP,US);
G11B27/328 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/45] | H04N5/93, H04N5/76, H04N5/907 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/40] |
Former [2002/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | TRICKWIEDERGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIGITALES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2006/32] | English: | TRICK PLAY APPARATUS FOR DIGITAL STORAGE MEDIUM | [2006/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE DE TRUCAGES DESTINE A UN SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE NUMERIQUE | [2006/32] |
Former [2002/45] | TRICKWIEDERGABEVERFAHREN FÜR DIGITALES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | ||
Former [2002/45] | TRICK PLAY METHOD FOR DIGITAL STORAGE MEDIUM | ||
Former [2002/45] | PROCEDE DE LECTURE DE TRUCAGES DESTINE A UN SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE NUMERIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2001 | Translation filed | 21.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 06.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6016381 (TAIRA KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,7-9,12,13 * column W *; | [A]EP0644692 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-4,7-9,12,13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH11155130 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH11261964 (SHARP KK) |