EP1284272 - ESTRA-1,3,5(10)-TRIENE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/08] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INO, Yoji, Pharmaceutical Res. Inst. 1188, Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411-8731 / JP | 02 /
AMISHIRO, Nobuyoshi, Pharmaceutical Research Inst. 1188, Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411-8731 / JP | 03 /
MIYATA, Mayumi, Head Office, Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd., 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | 04 /
AGATSUMA, Tsutomu, Tokyo Res. Lab., Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd., 6-6, Asahi-machi 3-chome Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-8533 / JP | 05 /
HAYASHI, Kozue, Pharmaceutical Res. Inst. 1188, Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411-8731 / JP | 06 /
TAKAHASHI, Takeshi, Pharmaceutical Res. Inst. 1188, Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411-8731 / JP | 07 /
AKINAGA, Shiro, Head Office, Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd., 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | 08 /
MURAKATA, Chikara, Pharmaceutical Res. Inst. 1188, Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411-873 / JP | [2003/08] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/08] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01922046.6 | 24.04.2001 | [2003/08] | WO2001JP03505 | Priority number, date | JP20000121960 | 24.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000121960 | [2003/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0181364 | Date: | 01.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1284272 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07J41/00, C07J43/00, A61K31/56, A61K31/58, A61P43/00, A61P5/24, A61P5/32, A61P35/00, A61P13/08, A61P15/00 | [2003/08] | CPC: |
C07J43/00 (EP,US);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP);
A61P5/28 (EP);
A61P5/32 (EP);
C07J41/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/08] | Extension states | AL | 05.11.2002 | LT | 05.11.2002 | LV | 05.11.2002 | MK | 05.11.2002 | RO | 05.11.2002 | SI | 05.11.2002 | Title | German: | ÖSTRA-1,3,5(10)-TRIENDERIVATE | [2003/08] | English: | ESTRA-1,3,5(10)-TRIENE DERIVATIVES | [2003/08] | French: | DERIVES D'ESTRA-1,3,5(10)-TRIENE | [2003/08] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2002 | Translation filed | 05.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/08] | 07.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/15] | 14.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - LI, PUI-KAI ET AL, "Development of potent non-estrogenic estrone sulfatase inhibitors", STEROIDS (1998), 63(7/8), 425-432, XP004134764 [X] 1-28 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0039-128X(98)00044-0 | International search | [X]WO9832763 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US]); | [X]WO9903876 (UNIV HOLY GHOST DUQUESNE [US]); | [X]WO9933858 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US]); | [XP]WO0043408 (UNIV HOLY GHOST DUQUESNE [US], et al) |