EP1269654 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING TRANSMISSIONS OF A COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2012/49] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 2775 Morhouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALTON, Jay, R. 7 Ledgewood Drive Westford, MA 01886 / US | 02 /
WALLACE, Mark 4 Madel Lane Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 03 /
HOLTZMAN, Jack 12970 Caminito Bautizo San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 04 /
ANTONIO, Franklin, P. 2765 Cordoba Cove Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2003/01] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R G C Jenkins &Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01922596.0 | 20.03.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001US09325 | Priority number, date | US20000539157 | 30.03.2000 Original published format: US 539157 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0176098 | Date: | 11.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1269654 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1269654 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/24, H04W52/34, H04W52/26, H04B17/00 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
H04W52/343 (EP,US);
H04W52/24 (EP,KR,US);
H04B17/336 (EP,KR,US);
H04B17/382 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/241 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/244 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/267 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/286 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/34 (KR);
H04W52/346 (EP,US);
H04W72/52 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/542 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/569 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/01] | H04B7/005, H04Q7/36, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG VON ÜBERTRAGUNGEN EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMS | [2003/01] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING TRANSMISSIONS OF A COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2003/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DES TRANSMISSIONS D'UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 04.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.05.2012 | 08.05.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07024476.9 / EP1901442 | EP07024477.7 / EP1901443 | EP10169713.4 / EP2237441 | EP10184213.6 / EP2285171 | EP10184256.5 / EP2285172 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.12.2012 | BE | 05.12.2012 | CY | 05.12.2012 | DK | 05.12.2012 | FI | 05.12.2012 | IT | 05.12.2012 | NL | 05.12.2012 | SE | 05.12.2012 | TR | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.03.2013 | ES | 16.03.2013 | IE | 20.03.2013 | LU | 20.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | FR | 02.04.2013 | PT | 05.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IE | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 05.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5245629 (HALL SCOTT M [US]) [A] 1-9,11,14,15,18-22,32,40-46,102,112-115,118-120 * column A * * column 1, line 12 - line 22 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 5 * * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 37; figures 4-6 *; | [XA]US5448750 (ERIKSSON HAKAN O [SE], et al) [X] 48-56,64-82,86-89,91-94,116,117 * column A * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 3 * * column 6, line 27 - column 7, line 45; figures 2A,2B * * column 8, line 38 - line L * [A] 99-101; | [A]WO9833339 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 48,51-53,57-63,65-75,78,79,116,117 * page 1, line 17 - page 2, line 20 *; | [DXA]WO9835514 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [DX] 80-98 * page 14, line 3 - page 15, line 4; figures 1,2,6 * * page 22, line 30 - page 26, line 16 * * page 52, line 31 - page 55, line 22 * [A] 48-50,54,55,64,69,70,73,76,77,99-101; | [A]EP0869626 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-9,14,15,17-22,32,37-43,102,112-115,118-120 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 23 * * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 34; figures 1,2 * * column 6, line 28 - line 35 * * column 7, line 4 - line 16; figure 3 *; | [A]WO9957925 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 80,99 * abstract ** claims 1-4,7 *; | [A]WO9965158 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,10,27-32,102,103,113,118-120 * page 1, line 12 - page 2, line 5 * * page 8, line 27 - page 9, line 8 * * page 9, line 15 - line 23 * * claims 1,9-12 *; | [DA] - BINGHAM J A C, "MULTICARRIER MODULATION FOR DATA TRANSMISSION: AN IDEA WHOSE TIME HAS COME", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER. PISCATAWAY, N.J, US, (19900501), vol. 28, no. 5, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 5 - 8,11-14, XP000132491 [DA] 1,3,4,32,40,113,115 * page 5, column L, line 1 - line 40 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.54342 | [XA] - KATZELA I ET AL, "CHANNEL ASSIGNMENT SCHEMES FOR CELLULAR MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEMS: A COMPREHENSIVE SURVEY", IEEE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, US, (19960601), vol. 3, no. 3, ISSN 1070-9916, pages 10 - 31, XP000593925 [X] 48,51-53,56-63,65-75,78,79,116,117 * page 12, column R, line 4 - page 14, column R, line L * * page 15, column L, line 1 - page 19, column R, line 9 * * page 22, column L, line 25 - column R, line 7 * * page 28, column R, paragraph L - page 29, column L, line 35 * [A] 49,50,54,55,64,76,77 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/98.511762 | [XA] - ISHIKAWA Y ET AL, "AN ADAPTIVE CHANNEL ALLOCATION STRATEGY USING MULTIPLE OVERLAID PRIORITY FOR CELLULAR SYSTEMS", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART I - COMMUNICATIONS, SCRIPTA TECHNICA. NEW YORK, US, (19970201), vol. 80, no. 2, ISSN 8756-6621, pages 90 - 99, XP000689841 [X] 80-82,87-89,91-93 * section 2.1;; figures 1,2 * [A] 99-101 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6424(199702)80:2<90::AID-ECJA9>3.0.CO;2-E | Examination | WO9835519 | by applicant | US4901307 | US5103459 |