EP1276394 - MULTIPLE PURPOSE QUICK-CHANGEOVER EXTRUSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WENGER MANUFACTURING, INC. 714 Main Street Sabetha Kansas 66534 / US | [2008/26] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states WENGER MANUFACTURING, INC. 714 Main Street Sabetha Kansas 66534 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENGER, LaVon, G. 1524 Centennial Drive Sabetha, KS 66534 / US | 02 /
HAUCK, Bobbie, W. 603 Virginia Sabetha, KS 66534 / US | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01922810.5 | 28.03.2001 | [2003/04] | WO2001US10004 | Priority number, date | US20000536893 | 28.03.2000 Original published format: US 536893 | US20010818484 | 27.03.2001 Original published format: US 818484 | [2003/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0172150 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1276394 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1276394 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.10.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23P1/00, B01F7/00, B29C47/00 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
A21C1/003 (EP,US);
B01F33/80 (EP,US);
A23P30/20 (EP,US);
B29B7/726 (EP);
B29B7/728 (EP);
B29B7/7461 (EP);
B29B7/748 (EP);
B29B7/7485 (EP);
B29B7/94 (EP);
B29C48/285 (EP,US);
B29C48/38 (EP,US);
B29B7/42 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/04] | Extension states | AL | 28.10.2002 | LT | 28.10.2002 | LV | 28.10.2002 | MK | 28.10.2002 | RO | 28.10.2002 | SI | 28.10.2002 | Title | German: | SCHNELL WECHSELBARES EXTRUSIONSSYSTEM FUER VERSCHIEDENE ANWENDUNGEN | [2003/04] | English: | MULTIPLE PURPOSE QUICK-CHANGEOVER EXTRUSION SYSTEM | [2003/04] | French: | SYSTEME D'EXTRUSION A PERMUTATION RAPIDE ET A USAGES MULTIPLES | [2003/04] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2002 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 26.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 05.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 05.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 05.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2003 | 31.03.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   21.09.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.06.2008 | CY | 25.06.2008 | FI | 25.06.2008 | TR | 25.06.2008 | SE | 25.09.2008 | GR | 26.09.2008 | PT | 25.11.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
SE | 25.09.2008 | ||
GR | 26.09.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
SE | 25.09.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
SE | 25.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
FI | 25.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04307216 ; | [A]DE2034837 (MEYER SPEZIALMASCH BRUNO) [A] 61-69,78-104 * page 1, lines 1-6 * * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 18 * * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 3 ** page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 21; figures 1,2,4; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0507689 (PERRIN ROBERT [FR]) [A] 61-69,78-104 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 49; figure 1; claims 1-5 *; | [A]US5165950 (BOEHMER EDWARD W [US], et al) [A] 61-69,78-104 * column 1, lines 7-22 * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 41 * * column 4, line 4 - column 6, line 2; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5402352 (KNIEPMANN MARK R [US], et al) [A] 61-69,78-104 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 27 * * column 5, lines 43-55; figure 1; claims 1-12 *; | [A]DE19728624 (PFISTER SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 61-69,78-104 * column 1, lines 3-35 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 37 * * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 29; figures 1,2,4; claims 1,3,4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930317), vol. 017, no. 126, Database accession no. (M - 1381), & JP04307216 A 19921029 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [A] 61-69,78-104 * abstract * | International search | [X]US4752139 (HAUCK BOBBIE W [US]); | [A]US4882105 (VOLK JR JOSEPH A [US]); | [X]US5238385 (JOHNSON ROGER D [US]) |