EP1276949 - HEADLINER MOUNTED POWER LIFTGATE DRIVE MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.2006 [2006/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTIER AUTOMOTIVE CLOSURES INC. 521 Newpark Boulevard Newmarket, Ontario L3Y 4X7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states Intier Automotive Closures Inc. 521 Newpark Boulevard Newmarket, Ontario L3Y 4X7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANIELS, Andrew, R. 648 Bondi Avenue Newmarket, Ontario L3Y 8S8 / CA | 02 /
KACZMARCZYK, Aleksander 91A United Circle Newmarket, Ontario L3X 1X6 / CA | 03 /
JANDA, Miroslav 14 Yorkview Drive Toronto, Ontario M8Z 2E9 / CA | 04 /
TOMASZEWSKI, Kris 1053 Far North Circle Newmarket, Ontario L3X 1N4 / CA | 05 /
FROMMER, Thomas P. 4800 Herald Road, R.R. 1 Mount Albert, Ontario L0G 1M0 / CA | 06 /
PETROFF, Kathryn 281 Sutherland Drive East York, Ontario M4G 1J4 / CA | 07 /
KIREJCZYK, Juliusz, E. 1045 Far North Circle Newmarket, Ontario L3X 1N4 / CA | [2004/21] |
Former [2003/04] | 01 /
DANIELS, Andrew, R. 648 Bondi Avenue Newmarket, Ontario L3Y 8S8 / CA | ||
02 /
KACZMARCZYK, Aleksander 91A United Circle Newmarket, Ontario L3X 1X6 / CA | |||
03 /
JANDA, Miroslav 14 Yorkview Drive Toronto, Ontario M8Z 2E9 / CA | |||
04 /
TOMASZEWSKI, Kris 24 Fieldview Crescent Markham, Ontario L3R 3H7 / CA | |||
05 /
FROMMER, Thomas P. 4800 Herald Road, R.R. 1 Mount Albert, Ontario L0G 1M0 / CA | |||
06 /
PETROFF, Kathryn 281 Sutherland Drive East York, Ontario M4G 1J4 / CA | |||
07 /
KIREJCZYK, Juliusz, E. 1045 Far North Circle Newmarket, Ontario L3X 1N4 / CA | Representative(s) | Prato, Roberto Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | Prato, Roberto STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 01923452.5 | 27.04.2001 | [2003/04] | WO2001CA00572 | Priority number, date | US20000200047P | 27.04.2000 Original published format: US 200047 P | [2003/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0183924 | Date: | 08.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1276949 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1276949 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/12 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
E05F15/619 (EP);
E05F15/63 (EP);
E05F1/1091 (EP);
E05Y2201/214 (EP);
E05Y2201/218 (EP);
E05Y2201/232 (EP);
E05Y2201/246 (EP);
E05Y2201/416 (EP);
E05Y2201/462 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AN DER DACHVERKLEIDUNG ANGEBRACHTES ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR EINE FAHRZEUGHECKKLAPPE | [2003/04] | English: | HEADLINER MOUNTED POWER LIFTGATE DRIVE MECHANISM | [2003/04] | French: | MECANISME D'ENTRAINEMENT DE HAYON MOTORISE MONTE SUR GARNITURE DE PAVILLON | [2003/04] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 19.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3716945 (COOPER N, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 1 - line 5 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 46 * * figure - * [Y] 4-20; | [Y]FR2769941 (COUTIER MOULAGE GEN IND [FR]) [Y] 4-10,12-16 * page 3, line 19 - line 27 * * figure - *; | [Y]US2833536 (JOACHIM JOSEPH G, et al) [Y] 11,17-20 * column 1, line 20 - line 26 * * column 4, line 5 - line 6 * | by applicant | US5448856 |