EP1273050 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MULTI-LAYERED ACTUATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/01] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIESINGER, Thomas Holderstrasse 8 71277 Rutesheim / DE | 02 /
SCHULTE, Thomas James-F.-Byrnes-Strasse 44 70376 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
HAMMER, Marianne Buchklinger Weg 34 69517 Gorxheimertal / DE | 04 /
HENNECK, Stefan Ludwigstrasse 12 70839 Gerlingen / DE | 05 /
SUTER, Warren Muehlrain 7 70180 Stuttgart / DE | 06 /
LINDNER, Friederike Immelmannstrasse 24 70839 Gerlingen / DE | 07 /
HEJTMANN, Georg Lindenstrasse 4a 91224 Pommelsbrunn / DE | [2003/14] |
Former [2003/02] | 01 /
BIESINGER, Thomas Holderstrasse 8 71277 Rutesheim / DE | ||
02 /
SCHULTE, Thomas James-F.-Byrnes-Strasse 44 70376 Stuttgart / DE | |||
03 /
HAMMER, Marianne Don-Carlos-Strasse 4 70563 Stuttgart / DE | |||
04 /
HENNECK, Stefan Ludwigstrasse 12 70839 Gerlingen / DE | |||
05 /
SUTER, Warren Muehlrain 7 70180 Stuttgart / DE | |||
06 /
LINDNER, Friederike Immelmannstrasse 24 70839 Gerlingen / DE | |||
07 /
HEJTMANN, Georg Lindenstrasse 4a 91224 Pommelsbrunn / DE | Application number, filing date | 01923522.5 | 20.03.2001 | [2003/02] | WO2001DE01053 | Priority number, date | DE2000116429 | 01.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10016429 | [2003/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0175986 | Date: | 11.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1273050 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1273050 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/083, H01L41/24 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
H10N30/50 (EP,US);
H10N30/00 (KR);
H10N30/053 (EP,US);
H10N30/067 (EP,US);
H10N30/089 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24273 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24281 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MEHRSCHICHT-AKTOREN | [2003/02] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MULTI-LAYERED ACTUATORS | [2003/02] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'ACTIONNEURS MULTICOUCHES | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 22.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.01.2008 | DK | 02.01.2008 | FI | 02.01.2008 | IE | 02.01.2008 | NL | 02.01.2008 | TR | 02.01.2008 | LU | 20.03.2008 | BE | 31.03.2008 | CH | 31.03.2008 | LI | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | SE | 02.04.2008 | GR | 03.04.2008 | ES | 13.04.2008 | PT | 02.06.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
TR | 02.01.2008 | ||
LU | 20.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
LU | 20.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | DK | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 02.01.2008 | |
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 02.01.2008 | |
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | NL | 02.01.2008 | |
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 02.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH04148576 ; | [X]JPH0228977 ; | [XA]DE2746732 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE) [X] 4,5,7,8,10 * page 11, line 1 - page 13, line 16; figure 3 *[A] 6; | JPH04148576 [ ] (NEC CORP) [ ] * figures 1,3 *; | [XA]EP0530052 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [X] 4,5,7,9 * page 2, line 11 - page 3, line 46; figure 1; claims 8-13 * [A] 1-3,6,8 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920908), vol. 016, no. 429, Database accession no. (E - 1261), & JP04148576 A 19920521 (NEC CORP) [X] 1,3 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900406), vol. 014, no. 175, Database accession no. (E - 0914), & JP02028977 A 19900131 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * |