EP1373414 - RADIATON CURABLE AQUEOUS COMPOSITIONS FOR LOW EXTRACTABLE FILM PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION 35 Waterview Boulevard Parsippany, NJ 07054-1285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states Sun Chemical Corporation 35 Waterview Boulevard Parsippany, NJ 07054-1285 / US | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION 222 Bridge Plaza South Fort Lee, NJ 07024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHATTERJEEE, Subhankar 60 Norma Road Hampton, NJ 08827 / US | 02 /
LAKSIN, Mikhail 2278 Redwood Road Scotch Plains, NJ 07076 / US | 03 /
TURGIS, Jean-Dominique 74 Norse Avenue Rutherford, NJ 07070 / US | 04 /
BIRO, David, Dr. 42 Cayuga Avenue Rockaway, NJ 0766 / US | [2004/22] |
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
CHATTERJEEE, Subhankar 60 Norma Road Hampton, NJ 08827 / US | ||
02 /
LAKSIN, Mikhail 2278 Redwood Road Scotch Plains, NJ 07076 / US | |||
03 /
TURGIS, Jean-Dominique 74 Norse Avenue Rutherford, NJ 07070 / US | |||
04 /
BIRO, David 6 Dakota Trail Branchburg, NJ 08876 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01924645.3 | 03.04.2001 | [2004/01] | WO2001US10864 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02081576 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1373414 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09D4/00, C09D4/06, C09D11/00, C09D11/10 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
C08F290/04 (EP);
C09D11/101 (EP);
C09D4/00 (EP);
C09D4/06 (EP);
B41M7/0081 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08F220/00 (EP);
C09D4/06, C08F290/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | STRAHLUNGHÄRTBARE, WÄSSRIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR FOLIENVERPACKUNGEN MIT GERINGEM EXTRAHIERBAREM ANTEIL | [2004/01] | English: | RADIATON CURABLE AQUEOUS COMPOSITIONS FOR LOW EXTRACTABLE FILM PACKAGING | [2004/01] | French: | COMPOSITIONS AQUEUSES DURCISSABLES PAR RAYONNEMENT POUR FILM D'EMBALLAGE FAIBLEMENT EXTRACTIBLE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 09.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 10.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 03.11.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9936482 (VALSPAR CORP) [X] 1-50 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9413467 (HOECHST AG ;HOECHST CELANESE CORP (US); BENNETT CYNTHIA (DE); CHOE) [X] 1-50 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9919369 (TURGIS JEAN DOMINQUE ;SUN CHEMICAL CORP (US); ROONEY JOHN (US); LA) [X] 1-50 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2739838 (THIEBAUT CHANTAL) [A] 1-50 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0034400 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS ;YONEHARA HISATOMO (JP); LEE SEUNG TAEG) [A] 1-50 * the whole document *; | [A]US5952401 (NOGUCHI HIROMICHI ET AL) [A] 1-50 * the whole document * |