EP1287488 - ADAPTIVE LEARNING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pacific Edge Limited Level 6, Otago House, 481 Moray Place Dunedin / NZ | [2017/31] |
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states Pacific Edge Biotechnology Limited Level 6, Otago House, 481 Moray Place Dunedin / NZ | ||
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states The University of Otago Leith Street Dunedin / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASABOV, Nikola Kirilov 8 Spylaw Street Maori Hill Dunedin / NZ | [2017/40] |
Former [2003/10] | 01 /
KASABOV, Nikola Kirilov 8 Spylaw Street, Maori Hill Dunedin / NZ | Representative(s) | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/40] |
Former [2003/10] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01926261.7 | 10.04.2001 | [2003/10] | WO2001NZ00059 | Priority number, date | NZ20000503882 | 10.04.2000 Original published format: NZ 50388200 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0178003 | Date: | 18.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1287488 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1287488 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.10.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
G06N3/043 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/10] | G06N3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2017/40] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ADAPTIVES LERNSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2003/10] | English: | ADAPTIVE LEARNING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2003/10] | French: | SYSTEME ET TECHNIQUE D'APPRENTISSAGE ADAPTATIF | [2003/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 08.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 01.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2006 | 30.04.2008 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2008 | 30.04.2009 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   16.06.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.10.2017 | FI | 04.10.2017 | MC | 04.10.2017 | PT | 04.10.2017 | TR | 04.10.2017 | GR | 05.01.2018 | LU | 10.04.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | FI | 04.10.2017 | |
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
LU | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | FI | 04.10.2017 | |
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
LU | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 04.10.2017 | |
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
LU | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 04.10.2017 | |
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/26] | FI | 04.10.2017 | |
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 04.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0471857 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1,2,4 * * page 13, line 10 - page 14, line 10 *; | [X] - SHANN J J ET AL, "A fuzzy neural network for rule acquiring on fuzzy control systems", FUZZY SETS AND SYSTEMS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950512), vol. 71, no. 3, ISSN 0165-0114, pages 345 - 357, XP004011627 [X] 1-13 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 346, column 1, lines 1-3,10-14,25-30 * * page 246, column 2, lines 45-48 * * page 347, column 1, lines 1-4,11-13 * * page 347, column 2, lines 29-32 * * page 351, column 1, lines 2-6 * * page 351, column 2, lines 8-12,27-33,45-48 * * page 352, column 1, lines 5-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-0114(94)00277-E | [Y] - BERENJI H R ET AL, "Clustering in product space for fuzzy inference", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON FUZZY SYSTEMS. SAN FRANCISCO, MAR. 28 - APR. 1, 1993, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19930328), VOL. 2 CONF. 2, ISBN 0-7803-0614-7, pages 1402 - 1407, XP010103946 [Y] 1-13 * page 1402, column 2, lines 22-24 * * page 1403, column 1, lines 7-10 * * page 1405, lines 18-26 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FUZZY.1993.327598 | International search | [X]WO9422074 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]); | [X]EP0743604 (SHARP KK [JP]) | Examination | - MOREIRA M ET AL, "Neural Networks with Adaptive Learning Rate and Momentum Terms", INTERNET CITATION, (19951001), pages I - 1, URL: http://publications.idiap.ch/downloads/reports/1995/95-04.pdf, (20110505), XP002635433 | - KASABOV N ET AL, "Rule insertion and rule extraction from evolving fuzzy neural networks: algorithms and applications for building adaptive, intelligent expert systems", FUZZY SYSTEMS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, 1999. FUZZ-IEEE '99. 1999 IEEE I NTERNATIONAL SEOUL, SOUTH KOREA 22-25 AUG. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990822), doi:10.1109/FUZZY.1999.790109, ISBN 978-0-7803-5406-7, pages 1406 - 1411vol.3, XP032163207 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FUZZY.1999.790109 | by applicant | - BERENJI H R ET AL., "Clustering in product space for fuzzy inference", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON FUZZY SYSTEMS. SAN FRANCISCO, (19930328), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/FUZZY.1993.327598, pages 1402 - 1407, XP000371605 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FUZZY.1993.327598 | - KASABOV N; WOODFORD B, "Rule Insertion and Rule Extraction from Evolving Fuzzy Neural Networks: Algorithms and Applications for Building Adaptive, Intelligent Expert Systems", FUZZY SYSTEMS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, 1999. FUZZ-IEEE '99. 1999 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SEOUL, (19990822), vol. 3, XP010350803 |