EP1274716 - NOVEL NUCLEIC ACIDS AND POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuvelo, Inc. 675 Almanor Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2003/37] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states Nuvelo Inc. 670 Almanor Avenue Sunnyville, CA 94086 / US | ||
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states HYSEQ, INC. 670 Almanor Avenue Sunnyville, CA 94086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Y., Tom 4230 Ranwick Court San Jose, CA 95118 / US | 02 /
ASUNDI, Vinod 709 Foster City Boulevard Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 03 /
ZHOU, Ping 7595 Newcastle Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
XUE, Aidong, J. 1621 S. Mary Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 05 /
REN, Feiyan 7703 Oak Meadow Court Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 06 /
ZHANG, Jie 4930 Poplar Terrace Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 07 /
WANG, Jian-Rui 744 Stendhal Lane Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 08 /
YANG, Yonghong 4230 Ranwick Court San Jose, CA 95118 / US | 09 /
ZHAO, Qing, A. 1556 Kooser Road San Jose, CA 95118 / US | 10 /
GOODRICH, Ryle, W. 4896 Sandy Lane San Jose, CA 95124 / US | 11 /
LIU, Chenghua 1125 Ranchero Way 14 San Jose, CA 95117 / US | 12 /
DRMANAC, Radoje, T. 850 East Greenwich Place Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 13 /
MA, Yunqing 280 W. California Avenue 206 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 14 /
WANG, Zhiwei 836 Alturas Avenue B36 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | 15 /
WEHRMAN, Tom 3210 CCSR Mol Pharm, 269 W. Campus Drive Stanford, CA 94305 / US | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/03] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Dietmar Forstmeyer, Bereiteranger 15 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01926385.4 | 16.04.2001 | [2003/03] | WO2001US08655 | Priority number, date | US20000522929 | 18.04.2000 Original published format: US 522929 | US20000668317 | 22.09.2000 Original published format: US 668317 | US20000695783 | 24.10.2000 Original published format: US 695783 | US20000728628 | 01.12.2000 Original published format: US 728628 | US20010770160 | 26.01.2001 Original published format: US 770160 | US20010783066 | 13.02.2001 Original published format: US 783066 | US20010816828 | 22.03.2001 Original published format: US 816828 | [2003/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0179254 | Date: | 25.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1274716 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.10.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/04, C07K14/47 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/03] | C07H21/04, C12N15/11, C12N15/63, C12N15/70, C07K14/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE NUKLEINSÄUREN UND POLYPEPTIDE | [2003/03] | English: | NOVEL NUCLEIC ACIDS AND POLYPEPTIDES | [2003/03] | French: | NOUVEAUX ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ET NOUVEAUX POLYPEPTIDES | [2003/03] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2002 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 12.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/30] | Divisional application(s) | EP05005147.3 / EP1591448 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - YOSHIHARA YOSHIHIRO ET AL, "OCAM: A new member of the neural cell adhesion molecule family related to zone-to-zone projection of olfactory and vomeronasal axons", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (1997), vol. 17, no. 15, ISSN 0270-6474, pages 5830 - 5842, XP002273373 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * | International search | [X] - TANIGAMI ET AL., "NECO human cDNA sequencing project", GENEMBL, (20000222), Database accession no. AK000681, XP002946030 | [X] - "National cancer institute, cancer genome anatomy project, tumor gene index", EST, NCI-CGAP, (19970805), Database accession no. AA527712, XP002946029 |