EP1350284 - Electrical circuit for a vehicle for coupling a microphone to a telephone transceiver and a voice recognition cirircuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/41] | VEHICLE REARVIEW MIRROR ASSEMBLY INCORPORATING A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
[2012/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gentex Corporation 600 North Centennial Street Zeeland, MI 49464 / US | [2003/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURNBULL, Robert, R. 3950 Vermae Drive Holland, MI 49424 / US | 02 /
KNAPP, Robert, C. 5749 Beechwood Coloma, MI 49038 / US | 03 /
WALSTRA, Eric, J. 941 Brownell, S.E. Grand Rapids, MI 49508 / US | 04 /
WATSON, Alan, R. 13442 Burgoyne Buchanan, MI 49107 / US | 05 /
POE, G., Bruce 3175 - 42nd Street Hamilton, MI 49419 / US | 06 /
ROBERTS, John, K. 1061 Plymouth Avenue, S.E. East Grand Rapids, MI 49506 / US | 07 /
RUMSEY, Wayne, J. 10660 Fawn View Court Zeeland, MI 49464 / US | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/13] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/41] | Frost, Alex John, et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01926704.6 | 06.04.2001 | [2003/41] | WO2001US11310 | Priority number, date | US20000195509P | 06.04.2000 Original published format: US 195509 P | US20000216297P | 06.07.2000 Original published format: US 216297 P | US20000242465P | 23.10.2000 Original published format: US 242465 P | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0180353 | Date: | 25.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1350284 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1350284 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.10.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/12, H01Q1/32, H01Q5/00, H01Q9/04, H01Q9/30, H01Q21/28, H01Q21/30, H04B1/38, H04M1/60, H04R1/08 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
H04R1/08 (EP,US);
B60R1/12 (EP,US);
H01Q1/3266 (EP,US);
H01Q21/28 (EP,US);
H01Q21/30 (EP,US);
H01Q5/371 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0407 (EP,US);
H01Q9/30 (EP,US);
H04B1/3805 (EP,US);
H04M1/6075 (EP,US);
H04M1/6091 (EP,US);
B60R1/1207 (EP,US);
B60R2001/1223 (EP,US);
B60R2001/1261 (EP,US);
B60R2001/1284 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0075 (EP,US);
B60W2556/50 (EP,US);
H04B1/3822 (EP,US);
H04M1/271 (EP,US);
H04M2250/02 (EP,US);
H04M2250/10 (EP,US);
H04R2499/13 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/46] | B60R1/12, H01Q1/32, H04M1/21, H04M1/02, H04B1/38, H04M1/27, H04M1/60 | ||
Former IPC [2003/41] | H01Q1/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [2012/10] |
Former [2003/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI | Title | German: | Elektrische Schaltung für ein Fahrzeug zum Anschliessen eines Mikrofons an einen Telefon-Sende-Empfänger und eine Spracherkennungsschaltung | [2012/09] | English: | Electrical circuit for a vehicle for coupling a microphone to a telephone transceiver and a voice recognition cirircuit | [2012/09] | French: | Circuit électrique pour un véhicule pour coupler un microphone à un émetteur-récepteur téléphonique et und dispositif de reconnaissance vocale | [2012/09] |
Former [2003/41] | FAHRZEUG-RÜCKSPIEGELBAUGRUPPE MIT INTEGRIERTEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2003/41] | VEHICLE REARVIEW MIRROR ASSEMBLY INCORPORATING A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
Former [2003/41] | RETROVISEUR POUR VEHICULE RENFERMANT UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2002 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.02.2012 | 10.02.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2006 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21] | Request for further processing for: | 02.02.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 02.02.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.06.2013 | IT | 12.06.2013 | [2014/24] |
Former [2014/09] | AT | 12.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19640735 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,5 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 29 * * column 4, lines 60-62 * * column 6, lines 9-31; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US5815820 (KIEM JOSHUA P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * figures 1-6 * * column 9, line 22 - column 10, line 5 * * column 10, line 67 - column 11, line 2 * * column 11, lines 29-51 * * column 12, lines 13-15,23-29 * [Y] 4,11; | [X]US5878353 (UL AZAM ZAFAR [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11,16,20,21,28-30 * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 46 * * column 6, line 24 - column 7, line 4; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5898392 (BAMBINI JOHN S [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11,12,15,16,20,21,26-31,34-38 * abstract * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 56 * * column 4, line 28 - column 6, line 67 * * column 7, lines 27-32 * * column 8, lines 17-36 * * column 9, lines 1-6,19-43 * * column 11, line 34 - column 12, line 35 *; | [X]US6026162 (PALETT ANTHONY P [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,11,12,22-25,28-30,35 * figures 1-5,15,24-26 * * column 4, lines 17-51 * * column 5, lines 14-20,34-45 * * column 6, lines 13-28,45-49,61-66 * * column 7, lines 1-5,20-25 * * column 8, lines 7-32 * * column 9, lines 24-35,53-57 *; | [XY] - HAFNER, "Modularität versus Komplexität am Beispiel eines neuen Dachhimmelmodules", VDI BERICHTE, DUESSELDORF, DE, (1996), vol. 1287, ISSN 0083-5560, pages 569 - 582, XP002092420 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 4,11 | [PX] - NUSSER R ET AL, "Bluetooth-based wireless connectivity in an automotive environment", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2000. IEEE VTS FALL VTC 2000. 52ND SEPT. 24-28, 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20000924), ISBN 0-7803-6507-0, pages 1935 - 1942, XP010524360 [PX] 12-14,19-27,31,32 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2000.886152 | International search | [X]US5177685 (DAVIS JAMES R [US], et al); | [X]US5576687 (BLANK RODNEY K [US], et al); | [A]US5671996 (BOS BRENT J [US], et al); | [X]US5815820 (KIEM JOSHUA P [US], et al); | [A]US5829782 (BREED DAVID S [US], et al); | [A]US5938321 (BOS BRENT J [US], et al); | [X]US5971552 (O'FARRELL DESMOND J [US], et al); | [X]US6011518 (YAMAGISHI HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [X]US6019475 (LYNAM NIALL R [US], et al); | [XP]US6081237 (SATO SHINICHI [JP], et al) |