EP1311545 - COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING ENDOTHELIAL CELL ADHESION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McGill University 845 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal, QC H3A 2T5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states McGILL UNIVERSITY 845 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal, Québéc H3A 2T5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLASCHUK, Orest W. Suite 1520, 4998 De Maisonneuve West Westmount, Québec H3Z 1N2 / CA | 02 /
GOUR, Barbara J. RR 4, 2890 Donnelly Drive Kemptville, Ontario K0G 1J0 / CA | 03 /
FAROOKHI, Riaz 4242 West Hill Avenue Montreal, Québec H4B 2S7 / CA | 04 /
ALI, Anmar 580 Browning Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1G 0T4 / CA | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/21] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01926823.4 | 09.04.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001US11669 | Priority number, date | US20000544782 | 07.04.2000 Original published format: US 544782 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0177146 | Date: | 18.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1311545 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/705, A61K38/17, // (A61K38/17, 39:395) | [2003/21] | CPC: |
C07K7/06 (EP,US);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
C07K7/56 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND METHODEN ZUR MODULIERUNG VON ENDOTHELZELLENADHÄSION | [2003/21] | English: | COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING ENDOTHELIAL CELL ADHESION | [2003/21] | French: | COMPOSES ET PROCEDES DE MODULATION DE L'ADHESION DES CELLULES ENDOTHELIALES | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 22.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/05] | 07.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9802452 (UNIV MCGILL [CA]) [X] 1-68 * the whole document * [Y] 69-100; | [A]WO9845319 (UNIV MCGILL [CA], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [XY]WO9933875 (UNIV MCGILL [CA], et al) [X] 1-68 * the whole document * [Y] 69-100; | [XY] - WILLIAMS E.A., "A novel family of cyclic peptide antagonists suggests that N-cadherin specificity is determined by amino acids that flank the HAV motif", J.BIOL.CHEM, (20000211), vol. 275, no. 6, pages 4007 - 4012, XP002184576 [X] 1-68 * the whole document * [Y] 69-100 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.275.6.4007 | [XY] - BLASCHUK, OREST WILLIAM (1) ET AL, "A novel cadherin antagonist ( Exherin ) blocks human ovarian tumor growth in nude mice.", MOLECULAR BIOLOGY OF THE CELL, (NOV., 1999) VOL. 10, NO. SUPPL., PP. 72A. MEETING INFO.: 39TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR CELL BIOLOGY WASHINGTON, D.C., USA DECEMBER 11-15, 1999 THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR CELL BIOLOGY., XP001050319 [X] 69,70 * the whole document * [Y] 69-84 | [Y] - STARZINSKY-POWITZ E.A., "The putative role of cell ahesion moecules in endometrisis", MOL.MED.TODAY, (1999), vol. 5, no. 7, pages 304 - 309, XP001034952 [Y] 85-100 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1357-4310(99)01497-5 |