EP1281024 - ANGLED BED FOR REGENERATIVE HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEGTEC SYSTEMS, INC. 830 Prosper Road Depere, Wisconsin 54115 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states MEGTEC SYSTEMS, INC. 830 Prosper Road De Pere, Wisconsin 54115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRIA, Michael, P. 943 South Jackson Street Green Bay, WI 54301 / US | [2003/06] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Roberts, Mark Peter, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/36] | Roberts, Mark Peter, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2003/06] | Barlow, Roy James J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01927120.4 | 16.04.2001 | [2003/06] | WO2001US12489 | Priority number, date | US20000569554 | 12.05.2000 Original published format: US 569554 | [2003/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0188436 | Date: | 22.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1281024 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F23D11/44, F27D17/00, F23L15/02 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
F23G7/068 (EP,US);
F23L15/02 (EP,US);
F28D17/02 (EP,US);
F23L2900/15021 (EP,US);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US);
Y02P80/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GENEIGTES BETT FÜR REGENERATIVEN WÄRMETAUSCHER | [2003/06] | English: | ANGLED BED FOR REGENERATIVE HEAT EXCHANGER | [2003/06] | French: | LIT ANGULAIRE POUR ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR REGENERATIF | [2003/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 15.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 01.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5531593 (KLOBUCAR JOSEPH M [US]) [A] 1,9 * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 41; figures 4,5 * | International search | [X]US1895302 (WHEELER BRADLEY P, et al); | [Y]US2823027 (COBERLY CLARENCE J); | [Y]US4108733 (GERBER DONALD JOEL); | [X]US3384359 (KURT POTOCNIK); | [X]US1961510 (RYAN CHARLES F); | [A]US1703793 (STEIN CHARLES M); | [A]US1753467 (KARL KNIEPERT); | [A]US4067190 (HAMM JAMES R, et al); | [A]US5755569 (BERG LAWRENCE D [US], et al) | by applicant | US5531513 |