EP1272682 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A MATERIAL COATING ON A SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulzer Metco AG Rigackerstrasse 16 5610 Wohlen / CH | [2004/32] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states Jung, Werner Erlenstrasse 3 73061 Ebersbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jung, Werner Erlenstrasse 3 73061 Ebersbach / DE | [2004/32] |
Former [2003/02] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [2004/28] | Sulzer Management AG KS/Patente/0067, Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [2003/02] | Weigel, Matthias, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hagemann, Braun & Held Patentanwälte Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01927803.5 | 26.03.2001 | [2003/02] | WO2001EP03413 | Priority number, date | DE2000114353 | 24.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10014353 | DE2000128820 | 10.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10028820 | [2003/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0171053 | Date: | 27.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1272682 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1272682 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/12, B23K9/04, B23K9/09 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
B23K9/04 (EP);
C23C4/131 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES MATERIALAUFTRAGS AUF EINER OBERFLÄCHE | [2003/02] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A MATERIAL COATING ON A SURFACE | [2003/02] | French: | PROCEDE POUR APPLIQUER UN MATERIAU SUR UNE SURFACE | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 17.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 11.08.2004 | IE | 11.08.2004 | NL | 11.08.2004 | TR | 11.08.2004 | DK | 11.11.2004 | GR | 11.11.2004 | SE | 11.11.2004 | ES | 22.11.2004 | PT | 11.01.2005 | AT | 26.03.2005 | CY | 26.03.2005 | LU | 26.03.2005 | BE | 31.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/26] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
AT | 26.03.2005 | ||
CY | 26.03.2005 | ||
LU | 26.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
AT | 26.03.2005 | ||
CY | 26.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
AT | 26.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
AT | 26.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
AT | 26.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 11.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6487072 ; | [A]JPS6320168 ; | [A]JPH0292464 ; | [A]JPS6473066 ; | [A]DE2002472 (AFAM ARBEITSGRUPPE FUER ANGEWA) [A] 1 * figures 1-5; claims 1,4,5 *; | [A]US3637974 (TAJBL FRANZ, et al) [A] 1,6,18 * column 2, line 30 - line 43; figures 1-3; claims 1-19 *; | [A]FR2329098 (STK SCHWEISSTECHNISCHE KONSTRU [DE]) [A] 1,9,18 * figures 1-5; claims 1-14 *; | [A]US4453073 (BREDENKAMP GORDON L [ZA]) [A] 1,10,18 * abstract *; | [A]US4876433 (KASHIMA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,7,8,10-12,18 * column 2, line 9 - line 36; figures 4-10; claims 1-7 *; | [X]EP0435673 (DAIHEN CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,18 * abstract *; | [A]DE19611583 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [A] 13-15 * column 2, line 23 - line 27; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US5965038 (NOMURA YOSHIHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1-12,18 * column 2, line 1 - line 11 * * column 3, line 33 - line 46 * * column 5, line 3 - line 16; claims 1-4 * * column 9, line 35 - line 39; figures 1-40 *; | [A]US5990445 (OGASAWARA TAKAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,18 * figures 1-2C; claims 1-8 *; | [A]US6001426 (WITHERSPOON F DOUGLAS [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 13 - line 24; figure 1A; claims 19,26,30 *; | [A]EP0987339 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 16,17* figures 1,2; claims 1-3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890710), vol. 013, no. 296, Database accession no. (M - 846), & JP01087072 A 19890331 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1,13,14,18 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880624), vol. 012, no. 222, Database accession no. (M - 712), & JP63020168 A 19880127 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1,7-10,18 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900622), vol. 014, no. 291, Database accession no. (M - 0989), & JP02092464 A 19900403 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1,12,18 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890623), vol. 013, no. 275, Database accession no. (C - 610), & JP01073066 A 19890317 (RYODA SATO) [A] 13,14 * abstract * |